Cauzo v. Katane LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Cauzo
Defendant: Katane LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC and Massimo Guarnera
Case Number: 0:2020cv60396
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vecchio, Dallan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #12 Statement of Claim by Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC. (Vecchio, Dallan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallan Thomas Vecchio on behalf of Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC. Attorney Dallan Thomas Vecchio added to party Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dallan Thomas Vecchio added to party Bakery Italia, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dallan Thomas Vecchio added to party Massimo Guarnera(pty:dft), Attorney Dallan Thomas Vecchio added to party Katane LLC(pty:dft). (Vecchio, Dallan)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
March 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE #15 : Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/17/2020 (lk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC. (Amit, Adi)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adi Amit on behalf of Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC. Attorney Adi Amit added to party Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party Bakery Italia, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party Massimo Guarnera(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party Katane LLC(pty:dft). (Amit, Adi)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of: Claim by Antonio Cauzo re #4 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Requiring Combined Responses. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Antonio Cauzo. Katane LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Antonio Cauzo. Bakery Italia, Inc. served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Antonio Cauzo. Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Antonio Cauzo. Massimo Guarnera served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER re #4 Order. Instructions for Setting a Settlement Conference. The District Court has entered an Order (See DE #4 ) referring the case to the undersigned for a settlement conference. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer for the purpose of determining a date on which to conduct the settlement conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall call Chambers at 954-769-5450 with no fewer than three dates (for the full business day) on which the parties and their counsel will be available for the settlement conference, within the time period allotted by the District Court's Order #4 . Following the submission of proposed dates, the undersigned will enter an order setting the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 2/27/2020. (emd)
February 27, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [utility] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ls)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER In Actions Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC, Bakery Italia, Inc., Massimo Guarnera, Katane LLC. (jua)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12498016, filed by Antonio Cauzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cauzo v. Katane LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katane LLC
Represented By: Adi Amit
Represented By: Dallan Thomas Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakery Italia, Inc.
Represented By: Adi Amit
Represented By: Dallan Thomas Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakery Italia Coral Springs LLC
Represented By: Adi Amit
Represented By: Dallan Thomas Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massimo Guarnera
Represented By: Adi Amit
Represented By: Dallan Thomas Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Cauzo
Represented By: Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?