Nuwer et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Van Allen, Jason Nuwer, Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz and Christina Vigoa
Defendant: Grammer AG, FCA US LLC and Grammer Industries Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60432
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report sua sponte extending deadline for filing a Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/12/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/23/2020. (pb00)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by FCA US LLC. Answer/Response to First Amended Complaint due 5/22/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/7/2020. (pb00)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sarason, Scott)
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Roland Holt on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Michael Roland Holt added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft). (Holt, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M. Sarason on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Scott M. Sarason added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft). (Sarason, Scott)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Craig Jones on behalf of Grammer Industries Inc.. Attorney Steven Craig Jones added to party Grammer Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Jones, Steven)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Vigoa, Jason Nuwer, Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Kevin Van Allen. Grammer Industries Inc. waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Grammer Industries Inc., filed by Christina Vigoa, Jason Nuwer, Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Kevin Van Allen.(Widlanski, Benjamin)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Against Defendant Grammer AG by Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Jason Nuwer, Kevin Van Allen, Christina Vigoa (Widlanski, Benjamin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christina Vigoa, Jason Nuwer, Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Kevin Van Allen. FCA US LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Neary, Robert)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael A. Burger. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/5/2020. (pb00)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael A. Burger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12558835 by Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Jason Nuwer, Kevin Van Allen, Christina Vigoa. Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/28/2020. (pb00)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC, Grammer AG. (kpe)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Grammer AG. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12522799, filed by Christina Vigoa, Jason Nuwer, Amarillis Ginoris, Mark Minkowitz, Kevin Van Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) FCA US LLC f/k/a CHRYSLER GROUP LLC, #3 Summon(s) GRAMMER AG)(Widlanski, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuwer et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Van Allen
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Nuwer
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarillis Ginoris
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Minkowitz
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Vigoa
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grammer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grammer Industries Inc.
Represented By: Steven Craig Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?