SUNSTAR MBA, LLC v. COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SUNSTAR MBA, LLC
Defendant: COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC, COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC., MICHAEL BULANOV and ANDREY CHAGIN
Case Number: 0:2020cv60580
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. per DE #8 (cbr)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance with Order to Show Cause by SUNSTAR MBA, LLC re #6 Order to Show Cause (Prober, Bruce)
March 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE #6 : Amended Complaint due by 3/24/2020. (lk)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STRIKING #4 Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Disclosure(s) of DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by SUNSTAR MBA, LLC (Prober, Bruce)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL BULANOV, ANDREY CHAGIN, COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC.. (jua)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12610645, filed by SUNSTAR MBA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons)(Prober, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUNSTAR MBA, LLC v. COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNSTAR MBA, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Prober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPUTERS EVERYWHERE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BULANOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREY CHAGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?