Singleton v. THE MOVING EXPERT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Singleton
Defendant: THE MOVING EXPERT, INC. and MITCHELL KARVIN
Case Number: 0:2020cv60592
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Serve Electronically. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to serve electronically by Michael Singleton. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attempted Service, #2 Exhibit Attempted Service, #3 Exhibit Attempted Service, #4 Exhibit Attempted Service, #5 Exhibit Attempted Service, #6 Exhibit Attempted Service, #7 Exhibit Attempted Service, #8 Exhibit Attempted Service, #9 Exhibit Attempted Service)(Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File their Responses and Motions Jointly. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MITCHELL KARVIN, THE MOVING EXPERT, INC.. (kpe)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12625237, filed by Michael Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) The Moving Expert, #3 Summon(s))(Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. THE MOVING EXPERT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Singleton
Represented By: Tiffani-Ruth Imani Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MOVING EXPERT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL KARVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?