PNC Bank, National Association v. Traffic Brick Networks LLC, et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Andrew S. Walker, Traffic Brick Networks LLC, Unknown Tenant #3, Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant #4, 98 SE 7 LLC,, On Deck Capital, Inc., City of Deerfield Beach, Florida, Unknown Tenant #1, Andrew Walker, U.S. Small Business Administration, If Living, Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under, And Against The Above-Named Defendants, Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive, Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest As, Newbridge Global Sourcing LLC, and Swift Financial, LLC,
Case Number: 0:2020cv60609
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, National Association. Swift Financial, LLC, served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Emanuel, Ronald)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, National Association. City of Deerfield Beach, Florida served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Emanuel, Ronald)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, National Association. On Deck Capital, Inc. served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Emanuel, Ronald)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, National Association. Newbridge Global Sourcing LLC, served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Emanuel, Ronald)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent PNC Bancorp, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation for PNC Bank, National Association (Emanuel, Ronald)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certification of Possession of Original Notes by Ronald Marc Emanuel on behalf of PNC Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Term Note $840K, #2 Exhibit Exh B - Term Note $150K, #3 Exhibit Exh C - Revolving LOC Note $1.5M) (Emanuel, Ronald)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by PNC Bank, National Association for property located at 98 SE 7th Street, Deerfield Beach, FL 33441 (Emanuel, Ronald)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 98 SE 7 LLC,, City of Deerfield Beach, Florida, Newbridge Global Sourcing LLC,, On Deck Capital, Inc., Swift Financial, LLC,, Traffic Brick Networks LLC, U.S. Small Business Administration, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant #3, Unknown Tenant #4, Andrew S. Walker. (cds)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Foreclosure, Damages and Replevin against 98 SE 7 LLC, a Florida limited liability company, City of Deerfield Beach, Florida, If Living, Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under, And Against The Above-Named Defendants, Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive, Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest As, Newbridge Global Sourcing LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Swift Financial, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Traffic Brick Networks LLC, a Florida limited liability company, d/b/a Event Decor Direct, U.S. Small Business Administration, an agency of the Government of the United States of America, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant #3, Unknown Tenant #4, Andrew S. Walker. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12639479, filed by PNC Bank, National Association, a national banking association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Mortgage and Sec Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exh B - Term Note $840K, #3 Exhibit Exh C - Loan Agreement $840K, #4 Exhibit Exh D - Guaranty and Suretyship Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exh E - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Exh F - Term Note $150K, #7 Exhibit Exh G - Amended and Restated Loan Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exh H (Comp) - Revolving LOC Note $1.5M, #9 Exhibit Exh I (Comp) - PNC Card Agreement $250K, #10 Exhibit Exh J - Statement, #11 Exhibit Exh K - Guaranty and Suretyship Agreement TB to 98 SE &, #12 Exhibit Exh L - Guaranty and Suretyship Agreement - A Walker to 98 SE 7, #13 Exhibit Exh M (comp) - Assignment of Rents, #14 Exhibit Exh N - Rents Letter, #15 Exhibit Exh O (comp) - Commercial Guaranty - A Walker for TB, #16 Exhibit Exh P - Security Agreement, #17 Exhibit Exh Q - UCC, #18 Exhibit Exh R - Subordination Agreement, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Traffic Brick, #21 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - 98 SE 7, #22 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Andrew Walker, #23 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - US Small Business Admin, #24 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - City of Deerfield Beach, #25 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Newbridge Global, #26 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - On Deck Capital, #27 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Swift Financial, #28 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Unknown Tenant #1, #29 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Unknown Tenant #2, #30 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Unknown Tenant #3, #31 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Unknown Tenant #4)(Emanuel, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Traffic Brick Networks LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traffic Brick Networks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 98 SE 7 LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Deck Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Deerfield Beach, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: If Living, Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under, And Against The Above-Named Defendants, Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive, Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest As
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newbridge Global Sourcing LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Financial, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ronald Marc Emanuel
Represented By: Eric Bret Zwiebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?