Keyes v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Zachary Keyes
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv60636
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Medeiros, Crystalin)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as a stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (strauss@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 4/27/2020. (emd)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Calendar Call set for 1/26/2021 11:00 AM. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/5/2020. Mediation Deadline 10/12/2020. Motions due by 10/20/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Zachary Keyes (Messinger, Max)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zachary Keyes (Messinger, Max)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Mediation on June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Mark A Greenberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00am. (Greenberg, Mark)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANTS by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by no later than April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/8/2020. (fc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Medeiros, Crystalin)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Removal Status Report. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (fc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-12654614, payment transferred from : 0:20-cv-60635-XXXX Keyes v. AIG Property Casualty Company, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Medeiros, Crystalin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyes v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven Charles Teebagy
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Keyes
Represented By: Matthew David Gottlieb
Represented By: Max Michael Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?