Sanchez v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Clever Sanchez
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv60639
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clever Sanchez (Duboff, Kenneth)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 5/21/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Clever Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duboff, Kenneth)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geovera Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Clever Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duboff, Kenneth)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Pursuant to Southern District of Florida CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedure 3I(6), all proposed orders must be e-mailed in Word format (.doc or.docx) to the division e-mail address at Singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/8/2020. (eyr)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/29/2020 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fischler, Jeremy)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Clever Sanchez v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12657743, filed by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Fischler, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy Brett Fischler
Represented By: William Jacob Peterfriend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clever Sanchez
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Duboff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?