Cutri v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L
Plaintiff: Michelle Cutri and Michele Cutri
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L
Case Number: 0:2020cv60642
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement Jointly Filed by Michele Cutri (Cassel, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gerald T. Albrecht. Mediation Hearing set for 5/6/2020 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Selected/Added Gerald T. Albrecht as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m.. (Cassel, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 5/21/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2020., Discovery due by 1/28/2021., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2020., Mediation Deadline 2/4/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/12/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2021., Motions due by 2/12/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/11/2021.)( Mediation Deadline 2/4/2021.) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Michele Cutri (Cassel, Michael)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michele Cutri (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Cassel, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of interested parties within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/30/2020. (pb00)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Statutory Bad Faith Due to Breach of Sections 624.155 & 626.9541, Florida Statutes). Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12658550, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Zelonka, Richard) Modified text on 3/27/2020 (ar2). (State Court Answer filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutri v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cutri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Cutri
Represented By: Michael Alan Cassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L
Represented By: Richard Edward Zelonka, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Subscribing to Policy No. BB014330L
Represented By: Richard Edward Zelonka, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?