ERMI LLC v. Smith
Plaintiff: ERMI LLC
Defendant: Jeffrey Smith
Case Number: 0:2020cv60821
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. SEE DE 18 PAPERLESS ORDER. Claims shall proceed under 19-md-02914-RKA (ail)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court notes that this case is a member case in In Re: Ermi LLC ('289) Patent Litigation, 19-md-02914-RKA. The Clerk of Court is therefore instructed to administratively close this case while the claims proceed under 19-md-02914-RKA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/22/2020. (jz00)
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Georgia. Case Number 1:20-cv-01474 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:20-cv-60821-RKA on 4/21/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:19-md-02914-RKA. (mc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Edward Hine, Jr., mailing date 04/21/2020. (cco)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (mc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01474. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tcc)
April 21, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
April 21, 2020 Case electronically transferred to USDC SD FL for inclusion in MDL 2914. (tcc)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Cert copy of CTO-2 ORDER from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the USDC SD FL for inclusion in MDL 2914. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (tcc)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) of JPML re: MDL No. 2914, ERMI LLC ('289) Patent Litigation. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7-day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (ddm)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/10/20. (bnw)
April 9, 2020 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9568784. (Hine, Edward)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Randolph Edwards, III on behalf of Jeffrey Smith (Edwards, Richard)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Smith. Jeffrey Smith waiver mailed on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Edwards, Richard)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Hine, Edward)
April 8, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Smith. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by ERMI LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9568965) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-1, #2 Exhibit-2, #3 Exhibit-3, #4 Exhibit-4, #5 Exhibit-5, #6 Exhibit-6, #7 Exhibit-7, #8 Exhibit-8, #9 Exhibit-9, #10 Exhibit-10, #11 Exhibit-11, #12 Exhibit-12, #13 Exhibit-13, #14 Exhibit-14, #15 Exhibit-15, #16 Exhibit-16, #17 Exhibit-17, #18 Exhibit-18, #19 Exhibit-19, #20 Exhibit-20, #21 Exhibit-21, #22 Exhibit-22, #23 Exhibit-23, #24 Exhibit-24, #25 Exhibit-25, #26 Exhibit-26, #27 Exhibit-27, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERMI LLC v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Smith
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERMI LLC
Represented By: Edward Hine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?