Beauliere v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Roger Beauliere
Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated and JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Case Number: 0:2020cv60931
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re #8 Stipulation filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 First MOTION to Remand filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. Replies due by 6/3/2020. (Buckley, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Adoption by ABM Industries Incorporated Related document: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. Attorney David Alan Wagner added to party ABM Industries Incorporated(pty:dft). (Wagner, David)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by ABM Industries Incorporated. Attorney Clayton Wickliffe Thornton added to party ABM Industries Incorporated(pty:dft). (Thornton, Clayton)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand by Roger Beauliere. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bodden, Carlos)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Removal Status Report. Removal Status Report due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12861724, filed by a Foreign Profit Corporation JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Buckley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauliere v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Adam Patrick Haenel
Represented By: Michael B. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Represented By: Adam Patrick Haenel
Represented By: Michael B. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Beauliere
Represented By: Carlos Allenby Bodden
Represented By: William David Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?