Fox v. Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America
Plaintiff: April P. Fox
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 0:2020cv60936
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #10 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines. Revised summons, order and complaint forwarded to Marshal for service. (cbr)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America. (cbr)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING REVISED SUMMONS. By no later than June 26, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a revised summons with the address for Defendant's Registered Agent. The Clerk is instructed to process and send the revised summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROCESS SERVER. Plaintiff is instructed to file the summons on the docket by no later than June 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/28/2020. Summons and Order DE #6 placed in USMarshal's box. See attached document for full details. (scn) (lk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by April P. Fox as to Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America. (ls)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America. (lk)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROCESS SERVER. Plaintiff is instructed to file the summons on the docket by no later than June 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of U.S. Marshal Service as Special Process Server by April P. Fox. Responses due by 6/5/2020. (scn)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/15/2020. (fc)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by April P. Fox. (cbr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Deceptive Act or Practice Unjust Enrichment and Predatory against Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by April P. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cbr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Finance/ Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?