Doty v. ADT, LLC
Plaintiff: Shana Doty
Defendant: ADT, LLC, ADT, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services and Telesforo Aviles
Consolidated Plaintiff: Randy Doty
Case Number: 0:2020cv60972
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
2 Judge: Raag Singhal
3 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims against Telesforo Aviles are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 18, 2022 Filing 267 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal against Telesforo Aviles by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Salas, Natalia)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims against ADT are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Plaintiffs shall file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of any remaining claims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) no later than July 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 13, 2022 Filing 265 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Salas, Natalia)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL. Consent Motion DE #263 is GRANTED. Natalia M. Salas, Esq. is substituted for Karina de Oliveira Rodrigues, Esq. as local counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Karina De Oliveira Rodrigues and Kelley Uustal, PLC, are WITHDRAWN as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 29, 2022 Filing 263 Consent STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Natalia M. Salas for Karina de Oliveira Rodrigues by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 7/13/2022 (Salas, Natalia)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER re #260 Joint Notice of Settlement. The 6/17/2022 status conference and 7/11/2022 trial dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying without prejudice #259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
June 17, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Per DE #262 Order. Closing Case. (ebz)
June 17, 2022 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. Per DE #262 Order. (ebz)
June 16, 2022 Filing 260 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant ADT, LLC and Request to Vacate Pretrial and Trial Dates by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Salas, Natalia)
June 15, 2022 Filing 259 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Karina Rodrigues for / by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Attorney Karina de Oliveira Rodrigues added to party Randy Doty(pty:conpla). Responses due by 6/29/2022 (Rodrigues, Karina)
June 10, 2022 Filing 258 NOTICE of Settlement by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Salas, Natalia)
June 6, 2022 Filing 257 NOTICE by ADT, LLC re #227 Proposed Jury Instructions ADT LLC's MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM (McLoone, Jennifer)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #255 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stephanie S. McGraw. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/25/2022. (pb00)
May 25, 2022 Filing 255 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephanie S. McGraw. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15664948 by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 6/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER. Defendant ADT LLC's Unopposed Motion to Reset the Trial Date #253 Motion to Continue is GRANTED. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 26, 2022 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Reset The Trial Date by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Charlie Eblen, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Jason Scott)(McLoone, Jennifer)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying Without Prejudice #241 Motion to Deem Telesforo Aviles Unavailable Under Federal Rule of Evidence 804(a)(1). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
April 14, 2022 Filing 251 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Deem Telesforo Aviles Unavailable Under Federal Rule of Evidence 804(a)(1) filed by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Salas, Natalia)
April 7, 2022 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #241 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Deem Telesforo Aviles Unavailable Under Federal Rule of Evidence 804(a)(1) filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 4/14/2022. (McLoone, Jennifer)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 PAPERLESS Order Re-Setting Calendar Call and Trial. Calendar Call set for 9/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Jury Trial set for the two-week docket beginning 9/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/5/2022. (pb00)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER RE-SETTING TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 9/1/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Calendar Call set for 4/8/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Pre-Trial Conference. A Pre-Trial Conference will be held on August 19, 2022, at 2:000 p.m. (EDT) via Zoom. The parties can access the Pretrial Conference using the following link: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 160 382 6444Password: 4343If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603826444?pwd=VEpXK21KL2hqWjVHUHU1WDFDMlZwdz09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/4/2022. (pb00)
March 28, 2022 Filing 246 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Status Conference held on 3/28/2022. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Charles C. Eblen, Nicholas H. Rosinia. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER. ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment DE #151 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #194 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #193 ADT's Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
March 24, 2022 Filing 242 NOTICE by Randy Doty, Shana Doty re #227 Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiffs' Written Objections to ADT's Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form (Salas, Natalia)
March 24, 2022 Filing 241 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Deem Telesforo Aviles Unavailable Under Federal Rule of Evidence 804(a)(1) by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email from Attorney Pappas, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Writ Habeas Corpus)(Salas, Natalia)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling Calendar Call set for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall attend the previously scheduled Status Conference via Zoom at 5:30 p.m. on 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/24/2022. (pb00)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference. A status conference will be held on March 28, 2022 at 5:30 p.m. (EDT) via Zoom. The parties can access the status conference using the following link: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 161 178 0619Password: 4343If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611780619?pwd=dERNajlsd0hLcUN4Y2h1MjFUZG1WUT09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/24/2022. (pb00)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel and for Sanctions DE #213 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/28/2022 at 05:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal via Zoom. A Zoom link will be sent in a separate order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2022. (pb00)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #233 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Zoe Seaman-Grant. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2022. (pb00)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #232 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Angela Reilly. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2022. (pb00)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #231 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eric Policastro. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2022. (pb00)
March 22, 2022 Filing 233 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Zoe Seaman-Grant. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15498180 by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 4/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salas, Natalia)
March 22, 2022 Filing 232 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Angela Reilly. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15498161 by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 4/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salas, Natalia)
March 22, 2022 Filing 231 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric Policastro. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15498122 by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 4/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salas, Natalia)
March 22, 2022 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2022 before Judge Raag Singhal, 1-51 pages, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (Shires, Karl)
March 21, 2022 Filing 229 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2022 re #222 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Pretrial Status Conference filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty, #213 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE PULSE SYSTEM AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty. Order forthcoming. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kerensa E.B. Cassis, Jennifer Ann McLoone, Charles C. Eblen, J. Eli Wade-Scott, Nicholas H. Rosinia, Amy K. Carter. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
March 18, 2022 Filing 228 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalia Maria Salas on behalf of Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Attorney Natalia Maria Salas added to party Randy Doty(pty:conpla), Attorney Natalia Maria Salas added to party Shana Doty(pty:pla). (Salas, Natalia)
March 15, 2022 Filing 227 Proposed Jury Instructions by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 226 PRETRIAL STIPULATION [JOINT] by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit List with Objections, #2 Exhibit B: Defendant's Trial Exhibit List with Objections, #3 Exhibit C: Plaintiffs' Trial Witness List, #4 Exhibit D: Defendant's Trial Witness List)(Raggio, John)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing. A hearing on #213 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel and a Status Conference will be held on March 21, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom. One hour is reserved for this hearing. The parties can access the hearing using the following link:# Zoom Link Meeting ID: 160 415 2708Password: 4343If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1604152708?pwd=Z3RiUzQxR3I4S2x2L0prcjJEM0VjZz09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/14/2022. (pb00)
March 14, 2022 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Pretrial Status Conference filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 3/21/2022. (McLoone, Jennifer)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #221 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Matthew Ryan McCarley representing Doty, Shana (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Matthew McCarley. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/12/2022. (pb00)
March 11, 2022 Filing 222 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Pretrial Status Conference by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
March 11, 2022 Filing 221 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew R. McCarley for / by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 3/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Raggio, John)
March 9, 2022 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE PULSE SYSTEM AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 3/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jason Vandiver Deposition 6.2.21, #2 Exhibit 2 - Richard DeLoach Deposition 8.26.21)(McLoone, Jennifer)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 PAPERLESS ORDER. Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/7/2022. (pb00)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Calendar Call via Zoom. The Calendar Call will be held on March 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. The parties can access the Calendar Call using the following link: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 160 028 7752Password: 4343If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go:https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1600287752?pwd=cVB2SUR2dHJsRWk4aVRVY3dMeVJ3UT09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/7/2022. (pb00)
March 7, 2022 Filing 217 Clerks Notice to Filer re 215 Sealed Document, 216 Sealed Document. Document Not Captioned. In the Future the Filer must File a Notice of Filing with the attached Exhibit with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
March 4, 2022 Filing 214 NOTICE by Randy Doty, Shana Doty re #213 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE PULSE SYSTEM AND FOR SANCTIONS Filing Exhibits Under Seal (Raggio, John)
March 4, 2022 Filing 213 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE PULSE SYSTEM AND FOR SANCTIONS by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(Raggio, John)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order Withdrawing Reference to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle per DE #211 Order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/4/2022. (amb) Modified to remove text on 3/4/2022 (asl).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; granting #198 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 4, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE #211 Order. Responses due by 3/9/2022 (amb)
March 4, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 215 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2011237)
March 4, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 216 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2011237)
March 3, 2022 Filing 210 NOTICE of Striking #209 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew R. McCarley for / filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Raggio, John)
March 3, 2022 Filing 209 STRICKEN MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew R. McCarley for / by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Responses due by 3/17/2022 (Raggio, John) Modified per DE#210 NOTICE OF STRIKING on 3/3/2022 (ebz).
March 2, 2022 Filing 208 RESPONSE in Opposition re #193 Defendant's MOTION in Limine ADT LLC'S OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. Replies due by 3/9/2022. (Raggio, John)
March 2, 2022 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #194 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 3/9/2022. (McLoone, Jennifer)
March 1, 2022 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion re #198 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Opposed) filed by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
February 28, 2022 Filing 205 Exhibit and Witness List Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Disclosures by ADT, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoone, Jennifer)
February 28, 2022 Filing 204 Exhibit and Witness List Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Randy Doty, Shana Doty.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Raggio, John)
February 25, 2022 Filing 203 Exhibit List of Items Contained in Docket 198-1 by Randy Doty, Shana Doty.. (Raggio, John)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER that the Plaintiffs shall, by March 2, 2022, prepare and file an index of the items contained in Docket Entry 198-1. The index shall list each item contained in Docket Entry 198-1 separately by a descriptive title and each item shall bear the CM/ECF page number set forth at the top of the page. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 25, 2022 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #198 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Opposed) filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 3/4/2022. (McLoone, Jennifer)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #197 Motion for Leave to File filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty and #196 Sealed Document filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty. Motions terminated: #197 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/23/2022. (pb00)
February 23, 2022 Filing 199 NOTICE of Striking #197 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty, #196 Sealed Document filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty by Randy Doty, Shana Doty (Raggio, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Opposed) by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raggio, John)
February 22, 2022 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expedited Mtn to Compel)(Raggio, John)
February 22, 2022 Filing 196 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Raggio, John) Modified to unseal on 2/23/2022 (pes).
February 22, 2022 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
February 16, 2022 Filing 194 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
February 16, 2022 Filing 193 Defendant's MOTION in Limine ADT LLC'S OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McLoone, Jennifer)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to File Sur-Reply DE#187 , DE#75 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
February 1, 2022 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replies (Opposed) filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying as moot 118 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb) Modified to Unseal on 1/31/2022 (amb).
January 28, 2022 Filing 189 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Randy Doty, Shana Doty re #115 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty filed by Shana Doty and Dismissal of Class Allegations (Raggio, John)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 PAPERLESS ORDER expediting response to #187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replies (Opposed) filed by Shana Doty, Randy Doty. Response due by 2/1/2022. No reply will be filed except upon further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/26/2022. (pb00)
January 25, 2022 Filing 187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replies (Opposed) by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Raggio, John)
January 21, 2022 Filing 186 Defendant's RESPONSE to #176 Statement PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 21, 2022 Filing 185 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 20, 2022 Filing 184 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc., Other Affiliate The ADT Security Corporation for ADT, LLC (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #182 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ADT LLC's reply memorandum in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/20/2022. (pb00)
January 20, 2022 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 18, 2022 Filing 180 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. Defendant ADT LLC shall file with the Court by January 20, 2022, a statement disclosing the members of ADT LLC and each member's citizenship. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 7, 2022 Filing 178 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits to Plaintiff Shana Doty's Response to Defendant ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment by Shana Doty.. (Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 176 Statement of: Material Facts and Additional Facts in Support of Her Response to Defendant ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment by Shana Doty re #175 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shana Doty. Replies due by 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Aff of S. Doty, #2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 Planck Dep, #4 Exhibit 4 Emond Dep, #5 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 Def ADT Ans and Obj to P's ROGs_3rd set, #8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 Cole Dep (redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 Def ADT Ans and Obj to P's ROGs_1st set, #11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 13 US v Aviles Factual Resume, #14 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 16 (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 17 (Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 18 (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 19 (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 20 (Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 21 Expert Rep of E.B. Cole, PHD, #22 Exhibit 22 (Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 23 (Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 24 (Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 25 Email frm H. England to S. Doty, #26 Exhibit 26 (Under Seal), #27 Exhibit 27 (Under Seal), #28 Exhibit 28 Comparison Chart of ADT arguments, #29 Exhibit 29 North Dep, #30 Exhibit 30 (Under Seal), #31 Exhibit 31 (Under Seal), #32 Exhibit 32 Survey re ADT 0.27.20, #33 Exhibit 33 (Under Seal), #34 Exhibit 34 Screenshot frm ADT website)(Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #173 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 7, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 177 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2011237)
January 6, 2022 Filing 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to be Filed per Local Rule 5.4 by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #171 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's response to ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed 40 pages. The response will be in 12-point type, double-spaced, with no excessive footnotes. Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts will be limited to 15 pages, with the same conditions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/4/2022. (pb00)
January 4, 2022 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Randy Doty, Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES granting #168 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case Number 20-60972-CIV-SINGHAL is CONSOLIDATED with Case Number 21-80645-CIV-SINGHAL. Henceforth, all pleadings and papers shall be filed only in Case No. 20-60972-CIV-SINGHAL and shall bear the new consolidated caption set forth by the Court on page 1 of this Order. However, Plaintiffs response and Defendants reply memorandum to ADT, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment filed in Case No. 21-80645-CIV-SINGHAL shall be filed in that case. But all other motions and notices shall only be filed in Case No. 20-60972-CIV-SINGHAL.Case No. 21-80645- CIV-SINGHAL shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #167 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/7/2022. Replies due by 1/21/2022. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/22/2021. (pb00)
December 22, 2021 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 1/5/2022), MOTION to Designate the Additional Action as a Related Case re #165 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Shana Doty. (Raggio, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 167 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Summary Judgement Briefing Deadlines re #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shana Doty. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raggio, John)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER. Motion to Modify the Case Schedule DE#144 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The discovery deadline is extended to January 19, 2022, solely to accommodate resolution of the discovery requests made to Alarm.com. The remainder of the Motion is DENIED.. Discovery due by 1/19/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 16, 2021 Filing 165 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Shana Doty (Raggio, John)
December 9, 2021 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule filed by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Raggio, John)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #151 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/31/2021. Replies due by 1/17/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/9/2021. (pb00)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #158 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer in light of #159 Notice of Striking. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/9/2021. (pb00)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #157 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Christopher Michael Brown representing Doty, Shana (Plaintiff) terminated. Attorney John W. Raggio of the Fears Nachawati, PLLC, will continue as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/9/2021. (pb00)
December 9, 2021 Filing 160 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
December 9, 2021 Filing 159 NOTICE of Striking #158 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shana Doty by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 158 STRICKEN Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raggio, John) Modified per DE#159 NOTICE OF STRIKING on 12/9/2021 (ebz).
December 8, 2021 Filing 157 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting John W. Raggio for Christopher Brown by Shana Doty. Responses due by 12/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raggio, John)
December 6, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1039344)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting #147 Defendant's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Exhibit B, Exhibit D, and Exhibit E of the Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 5.4. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 154 NOTICE by ADT, LLC re #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT INDEX TO ADT LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (McLoone, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #150 Motion for Substitution of Counsel for failure to include a Certificate of Counsel regarding pre-filing conference as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/3/2021. (pb00)
December 3, 2021 Filing 152 Statement of: Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment by ADT, LLC re #151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(McLoone, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 151 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (McLoone, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 150 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting John W. Raggio for Christopher M. Brown by Shana Doty. Attorney John Warren Raggio added to party Shana Doty(pty:pla). Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Raggio, John)
December 2, 2021 Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McLoone, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Filing 148 Clerks Notice to Filer re #147 Unopposed MOTION To File Exhibits Under Seal . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (mc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION To File Exhibits Under Seal by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer) Modified relief on 12/2/2021 (mc).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #145 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ADT LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed 35 pages, double-spaced, 12-point font, with no excessive footnotes. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/1/2021. (pb00)
December 1, 2021 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
November 18, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2021 before Judge Raag Singhal, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (Shires, Karl)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Motion to Certify Class DE#138 is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff shall have until January 28, 2022 to dismiss the class allegations of the Amended Complaint and withdraw the Motion to Certify Class. The previously set discovery and dispositive motion deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 5, 2021 Filing 141 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Hearing on #138 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Ruling on Motion for Class Certification held on 11/5/2021. Order forthcoming. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jennifer Ann McLoone, Charles C. Eblen, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Nicholas Rosinia, Heather V. Davis, Amy K. Carter. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART #128 Defendant's Motion to Quash (the "Motion"). Although captioned as a motion to quash a deposition, Defendant's Motion is also based on Rule 26(c), which governs protective orders. See generally ECF No. #128 . Therefore, the Court deems the Motion to be a motion for a protective order under Rule 26(c), which Defendant may bring before the Court if the subpoenas seek irrelevant information. Auto-Owners Ins. Co. v. Se. Floating Docks, Inc., 231 F.R.D. 426, 429 (M.D. Fla. 2005) (citation omitted) (noting that party does not generally have standing to object to a subpoena issued to a third party, but may have standing for a protective order if the information is irrelevant); see also Feise v. N. Broward Hosp. Dist., No. 14-CV-61556, 2015 WL 13309321, at *2 (S.D. Fla. Apr. 27, 2015) (granting a motion to quash a subpoena based on plaintiff's personal right in the information). Based on a review of the Motion, #132 the Response to the Motion, #134 the Reply, and the record in this case, the undersigned finds that the information Plaintiff seeks from Mr. Raymond North (who was allegedly involved in the development and creation of the Pulse system) is relevant to the claims and defenses in this case. See generally ECF Nos. #47 (the First Amended Complaint) and #86 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Within three (3) days from the date of this Order, the parties must telephonically meet and confer to schedule the deposition of Mr. North. The deposition is limited to two (2) hours and to the following topics: (i) whether vulnerabilities to Pulse were identified, considered, or mitigated at Pulse's inception; (ii) what security standards were in place for Pulse at its inception; and (iii) what options were evaluated or discarded in the design of Pulse. See ECF Nos. #132 at 6, #134 at 4. Mr. North's deposition must be completed by the November 19, 2021 discovery deadline. See ECF No. 137 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/27/2021. (sd01)
October 26, 2021 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #115 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty by Shana Doty. Responses due by 11/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Discovery to be completed by 11/19/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/20/2021. (pb00)
October 20, 2021 Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
September 24, 2021 Filing 135 SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty filed by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Filing 134 Defendant's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS Motion re #128 Defendant's MOTION to Quash filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/23/2021 (ebz).
September 20, 2021 Filing 133 SUR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re #122 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law to #115 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F)(McLoone, Jennifer) Modified document link on 9/21/2021 (ebz).
September 16, 2021 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 Defendant's MOTION to Quash filed by Shana Doty. Replies due by 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Brown, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant ADT. Defendant may file a 5-page sur-reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class no later than 9/20/2021. Plaintiff may file a 3-page response to the sur-reply no later than 9/24/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/15/2021. (pb00)
September 14, 2021 Filing 130 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
September 8, 2021 Filing 129 REPLY to #122 Response/Reply (Other), Opposition to Class Certification by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 128 Defendant's MOTION to Quash by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McLoone, Jennifer)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #126 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicholas Rosinia. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/30/2021. (pb00)
August 27, 2021 Filing 126 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicholas Rosinia. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14964176 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 9/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents DE#103 is WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew in accordance with the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 26, 2021 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Compel by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Pending before the Court is #103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents Related to Defendant's Investigation (the "Motion"). The parties requested that the Court stay a ruling on the Motion pending the completion of certain depositions. ECF No. #113 . Accordingly, within 7 days from the date of this Order, the parties must file a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of the anticipated depositions and whether the Motion has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 8/19/2021. (sd01)
August 18, 2021 Filing 122 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law to #115 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McLoone, Jennifer)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Class Certification. Responses due by 8/18/2021. Replies due by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/10/2021. (pb00)
August 10, 2021 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 119 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(McLoone, Jennifer)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #117 Motion Agreed Motion Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Defendants Opposition to Class Certification will be due on 8/11/2021 and Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Class Certification will be due on 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/14/2021. (pb00)
July 14, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 118 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1902830)
July 13, 2021 Filing 117 Agreed MOTION Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #114 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file an unredacted version of her motion for class certification and accompanying exhibits under seal. These items should remain sealed permanently or until further Court order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/13/2021. (pb00)
July 12, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION to Certify Class , MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Shana Doty by Shana Doty. Responses due by 7/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J Eli Wade-Scott Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A - Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit A - Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit A - Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit A - Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit A - Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A - Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit A - Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit A - Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit A - Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit A - Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit A - Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit A - Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit A - Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit A - Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit A - Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit A - Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration, #20 Exhibit C - McCarley Declaration)(Brown, Christopher)
July 12, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brown, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Filing 113 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Compel by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #111 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Consideration of #103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Accordingly, the undersigned will stay a ruling on #103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel until the completion of the depositions currently noticed through June 17, 2021. Lastly, within 14 days of the completion of the scheduled depositions, the parties must file a Notice advising the Court whether any disputed issues remain regarding #103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/9/2021. (sd01)
June 9, 2021 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #103 MOTION to Compel Documents Related to Defendant's Investigation by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoone, Jennifer)
June 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #109 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Motion for Class Certification is due by 7/12/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/5/2021. (pb00)
June 4, 2021 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Class Certification Motion by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic motion hearing held on 10-16-2020 before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt, 1-21 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2021. (Savino, Dawn)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kerensa Cassis. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/18/2021. (pb00)
May 17, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kerensa Cassis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14693602 by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kerensa Cassis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
May 11, 2021 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Compel Documents Related to Defendant's Investigation filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 5/18/2021. (McLoone, Jennifer)
May 7, 2021 Filing 104 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Jeffrey Grubman. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Grubman, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION to Compel Documents Related to Defendant's Investigation by Shana Doty. Responses due by 5/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Christopher)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Jeffrey Grubman. Mediation Hearing set for 5/7/2021 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 5, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE by Shana Doty of Mediation (Brown, Christopher)
April 2, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE by Shana Doty of related action (Brown, Christopher)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring parties to submit a proposed Order Setting Mediation by 5/7/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/2/2021. (pb00)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying #95 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Deny Class Certification. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 31, 2021 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Support re #95 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Motion To Deny Class Certification filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
March 24, 2021 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Motion To Deny Class Certification filed by Shana Doty. Replies due by 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Eli Wade-Scott)(Brown, Christopher)
March 10, 2021 Filing 95 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Motion To Deny Class Certification by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
March 5, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE of Selection of Mediator by Shana Doty (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brown, Christopher) Text Modified on 3/8/2021 (ail).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER to Schedule Mediation. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 3, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Jeffrey Grubman as Mediator. SEE DE #91 Notice of Selection(ail)
March 3, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE by Shana Doty Selection of Mediator (Brown, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 3/25/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021., Discovery due by 11/5/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/5/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/12/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/16/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2021., Motions due by 12/3/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2022.) ( Mediation Deadline 11/12/2021.) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 4, 2021 Filing 89 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Shana Doty identifying Corporate Parent ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT SECURITY SERVICES, a Delaware limited liability company for Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
February 4, 2021 Filing 88 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties due by 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 13, 2021 Filing 86 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #58 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #78 Motion for Judicial Notice of Supplemental Facts. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 13, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Corrected Reply In Support of Motion for Judicial Notice by Shana Doty re #82 Reply to Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Defendant's Response) (Brown, Christopher) Modified docket text on 11/16/2020 (nc).
November 4, 2020 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Supplemental Facts re #66 Response to Motion filed by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle added. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
October 29, 2020 Filing 80 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2020 re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADT, LLC. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jennifer Ann McLoone, Charles C. Eblen, J. Eli Wade-Scott, Heather V. Davis. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
October 28, 2020 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Supplemental Facts re #66 Response to Motion filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 11/4/2020. (McLoone, Jennifer)
October 27, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Supplemental Facts re #66 Response to Motion by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Information, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Indictment, #3 Exhibit Plea Agreement, #4 Exhibit Factual Resume)(Brown, Christopher)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #76 Motion Take Judicial Notice for failure to certify compliance with the requirements Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/26/2020. (pb00)
October 26, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #66 Response to Motion by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Information, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Indictment, #3 Exhibit Plea Agreement, #4 Exhibit Factual Resume)(Brown, Christopher) Modified docket text on 10/27/2020 (nc).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying #57 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
October 22, 2020 Filing 74 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2020 re #57 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Shana Doty. Order to follow. (Digital PMH_01_101620) (tw) Modified on 10/22/2020 (tw).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #57 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. At that time, the Parties shall call (888) 273-3658 to attend the conference and enter the access code 6319427 followed by the # symbol. The Parties should contact Chambers immediately, (954) 769-5470, if they experience any difficulties accessing the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/16/2020. (hhr)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. The hearing may be joined at telephone number 877.402.9753, access code 4709496. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2020. (pb00)
October 2, 2020 Filing 69 Joint MOTION For Entry of Confidentiality And Protective Order And Order Regarding Electronic Discovery by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McLoone, Jennifer)
September 21, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Five (5) Excess Pages. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/14/2020. (pb00)
September 8, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shana Doty. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Brown, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Its Reply In Support of Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 9/22/2020), MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #57 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Shana Doty. Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/8/2020. (pb00)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file a response not to exceed 30 pages in length, double-spaced, with 12-point font, no excessive footnotes, 1" margins on top, bottom, and each side, and 1/2" paragraph indentations. Footnotes may be single spaced. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/8/2020. (pb00)
September 4, 2020 Filing 62 HEARING EXHIBITS Exhibit A by Shana Doty. Related document: #61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Shana Doty.(Brown, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McLoone, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (McLoone, Jennifer)
August 12, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 2-C, #6 Exhibit 2-D, #7 Exhibit 2-E, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Christopher)
August 12, 2020 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 6-16-2020 before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt, 1-24 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2020. (Savino, Dawn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 55 EXHIBITS 1 by Shana Doty. Related document: #47 Amended Complaint filed by Shana Doty.(Brown, Christopher)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a motion in response to Plaintiff's Complaint not to exceed 30 pages in length, double-spaced, with 12-point font, no excessive footnotes, 1" margins on top, bottom, and each side, and 1/2" paragraph indentations. Footnotes may be single spaced. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/11/2020. (pb00)
August 10, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
August 4, 2020 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Telesforo Aviles. (kpe)
August 4, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Agreed Motion to Set or Modify Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Compel Arbitration. Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 22, 2020 Filing 49 Agreed MOTION to Set or Modify Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of #47 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2020. (pb00)
July 16, 2020 Filing 47 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shana Doty.(Brown, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Amy M. Carter. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/16/2020. (pb00)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/15/2020. Judge Roy K. Altman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
July 10, 2020 Filing 44 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by ADT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoone, Jennifer)
July 10, 2020 Filing 43 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 42 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Shana Doty identifying Other Affiliate Alexia Preddy for Shana Doty (Brown, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #40 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint. The Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint by July 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/7/2020. (drd)
July 6, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Shana Doty. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/2/2020. (hhr)
June 25, 2020 Filing 38 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for AMY M CARTER. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13030573 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response shall be due July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/24/2020. (drd)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Heather V. Davis may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Shana Doty, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Heather V. Davis, at hdavis@clgtrial.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/24/2020. (hhr)
June 23, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #19 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/22/2020. (hhr)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates Of Interested Parties are due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 18, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT Inc. for ADT, LLC (McLoone, Jennifer)
June 18, 2020 Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 7/2/2020 (McLoone, Jennifer)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/17/2020. (drd)
June 17, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred John Saikali on behalf of ADT, LLC. Attorney Alfred John Saikali added to party ADT, LLC(pty:dft). (Saikali, Alfred)
June 17, 2020 Filing 27 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2020 re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Shana Doty. The Court deferred ruling on the motion. (Digital PMH_01_061620) (tw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Response in Support of Motion, #19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #15 Response in Support of Motion by Shana Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Brown on behalf of Shana Doty. Attorney Christopher Michael Brown added to party Shana Doty(pty:pla). (Brown, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE re #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Heather V. Davis. #22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amy M Carter. Local counsel must file documents under the name listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Karina de Oliveira Rodrigues. See #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/name-changes. It is not necessary to refile the motions. (pt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for AMY M CARTER. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13030573 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
June 15, 2020 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Heather V. Davis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13030549 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 #17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jason R. Scott and Charles C. Eblen may appear and participate in this action on behalf of ADT, LLC. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Jason R. Scott, at jscott@shb.com, and to Charles C. Eblen, at ceblen@shb.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/15/2020. (hhr)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #15 Response in Support of Motion by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply)(Rodrigues, Karina)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Rodrigues, Karina)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason R. Scott. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13005305 by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles C. Eblen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13005171 by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY in Support re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Rodrigues, Karina) Modified text on 6/9/2020 (kpe).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Hearing. Re: #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 6/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. At that time, the Parties shall use the AT&T Connect Audio Conference Monitor, available at https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/. The dial-in phone number is 888-273-3658 and the meeting access code is 6319427. The Parties should contact Chambers immediately, at (954) 769-5470, if they experience any difficulties accessing the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/16/2020. (hhr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Hearing re 11 Order, by Shana Doty. (Rodrigues, Karina)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(d) filed by ADT, LLC. Attorney Jennifer Ann McLoone added to party ADT, LLC(pty:dft). Replies due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoone, Jennifer)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring response to #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Defendant shall file a response of no more than eleven (11) pages on or before Friday, June 5, 2020. Plaintiff may file a reply of no more than three (3) pages on or before Tuesday, June 9, 2020. The parties shall confer and jointly provide the Court with proposed hearing dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/2/2020. (hhr)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 #4 #5 #7 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eli Wade-Scott, Benjamin H. Richman, Jay Edelson, and Matthew R. McCarley may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Shana Doty. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to J. Eli Wade-Scott, at ewadescott@edelson.com; to Benjamin H. Richman, at brichman@edelson.com; to Jay Edelson, at jedelson@edelson.com; and to Matthew R. McCarley, at mccarley@fnlawfirm.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/2/2020. (hhr)
June 2, 2020 Set Deadlines per DE 11 Order as to #8 MOTION for Protective Order. Responses due by 6/5/2020 Replies due by 6/9/2020. (kpe)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ADT, LLC. (kpe)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Affidavit DECLARATION)(Rodrigues, Karina)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew R. McCarley. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-12942062 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shana Doty (Rodrigues, Karina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jay Edelson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-12934457 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for BENJAMIN H. RICHMAN. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12934401 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for J. Eil Wade-Scott. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12934372 by Shana Doty. Responses due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rodrigues, Karina)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12898673, filed by Shana Doty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodrigues, Karina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doty v. ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Doty
Represented By: Karina de Oliveira Rodrigues
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Represented By: Heather V. Davis
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Represented By: J. Eli Wade-Scott
Represented By: Amy K. Carter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Brown
Represented By: John Warren Raggio
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Nicholas H. Rosinia
Represented By: Angela Reilly
Represented By: Eric Policastro
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Zoe Seaman-Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Represented By: Charles C. Eblen
Represented By: Alfred John Saikali
Represented By: Jason R. Scott
Represented By: Kerensa E.B. Cassis
Represented By: Stephanie S. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telesforo Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Randy Doty
Represented By: Christopher Michael Brown
Represented By: John Warren Raggio
Represented By: Angela Reilly
Represented By: Eric Policastro
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Zoe Seaman-Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?