Benson v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Benson
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., John Doe #1, Detective John Doe #2, U.S. Corrections, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Brevard Extraditions, LLC and Prisoner Transportation Services. LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv60977
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:20-cv-01202, filed 07/07/2020. (bb)
July 7, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 0:20-cv-60977 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (mee)
July 6, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per Order d.e. #16 . (mee)
July 6, 2020 Case Reopened in order to transfer to Middle District of Florida per Order d.e. #16 . (mee)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE,granting #13 Motion to Dismiss. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before July 10, 2020,the parties shall comply with the requirements of the May 29th Order, or show cause as to why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or, Alternatively Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Christopher Benson. Replies due by 6/22/2020. (Frankel, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or, Alternatively Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Alan Blaker added to party Brevard Extraditions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Blaker added to party PTS of America, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Blaker added to party Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Blaker added to party U.S. Corrections, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blaker, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Benson. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Frankel, David)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/26/2020 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Benson. Brevard Extraditions, LLC served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Frankel, David)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. PTS of America, LLC and U.S. Corrections, LLC shall submit either a single combined response or separate answers by June 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Benson. U.S. Corrections, LLC served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Frankel, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Benson. PTS of America, LLC served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Frankel, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Corrections, LLC. (mee)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PTS of America, LLC. (mee)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. (mee)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brevard Extraditions, LLC. (mee)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brevard Extraditions, LLC, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. f/k/a Prisoner Transporation Sevices, LLC, U.S. Corrections, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12900870, filed by Christopher Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Frankel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Corrections, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTS of America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brevard Extraditions, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services. LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Benson
Represented By: David Alan Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?