Suarez-Lau v. P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Julisa Suarez-Lau
Defendant: P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC doing business as PDKN Restuarant Group, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC doing business as The Balcony and P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC doing business as PDKN Restaurant Group
Case Number: 0:2020cv61136
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 7/9/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Snow for appropriate disposition of all pretrial discovery motions. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Julisa Suarez-Lau (Buckner, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC. (Seiler, John)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement and Extension of Time. The Defendants P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC, and P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, shall have through and including July 22, 2020, to respond to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seiler, John)
July 6, 2020 Reset Answer Due Deadline: P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC response due 7/20/2020; P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC response due 7/20/2020; P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC response due 7/20/2020. (ls)(per DE #19)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/6/2020. (mkz)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seiler, John)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Preston Seiler on behalf of P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC. Attorney John Preston Seiler added to party P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Preston Seiler added to party P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Preston Seiler added to party P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC(pty:dft). (Seiler, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Amended Summons Returned Executed. Service Date Not Entered; ERROR - The service date was not entered for Defendant. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#15]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 Amended SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julisa Suarez-Lau. P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (ls)(See Image at DE #14)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julisa Suarez-Lau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buckner, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Striking #11 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Julisa Suarez-Lau for Defendant P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC by Julisa Suarez-Lau (Buckner, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed,. Document and Defendant's Name Do Not Match on Return of Service (P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC); CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the corrected defendant name. (ls)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julisa Suarez-Lau. P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buckner, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC. (ls)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC. (ls)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC. (ls)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Julisa Suarez-Lau re #3 Summons Issued, #5 Summons Returned Unexecuted, #4 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buckner, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Julisa Suarez-Lau as to P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buckner, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC, P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC, filed by Julisa Suarez-Lau. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) PDKN, #2 Summon(s) PDKN P-7, #3 Summon(s) PDKN OP, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Buckner, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC. (scn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13004622, filed by Julisa Suarez-Lau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Buckner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez-Lau v. P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julisa Suarez-Lau
Represented By: Michael Lamar Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC doing business as PDKN Restuarant Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D.K.N. P-7, LLC
Represented By: John Preston Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D.K.N. P-7 OP., LLC doing business as The Balcony
Represented By: John Preston Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D.K.N. Holdings, LLC doing business as PDKN Restaurant Group
Represented By: John Preston Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?