Adidas AG et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Adidas International Marketing B.V., Adidas America Inc. and Adidas AG
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Michellelyh511, Hdkoco, elitefanaticshop.com, Jxingwangfs588, jerseycustom, zheyu jersey stores, Buybestgoods, buyitoutlet.com, Alicesoccer, swexb778, Davidjersey, Superjerseyfactory, jersey1234, elitejerseyvip.com, Cn-sell, Linshuai, Gemma_yong, Best_jerseystore, See you again, linduifenqin, yecheil.com, zuixiangqiqing, buling_buling_store, Binnington, Ladies-Fashions, shiguoming, Benwon, Best2018jersey, Laine, dhp_59, usaexpresss, Prosoccer, all_star_jerseys, jerseyspromart.com, yesyeezy.cn, elitejerseydeals.com, sneakerhead.su, whatsyourdream, weuquantuiqi, jerseyoutlets, Maillot De Foot, Xiaodouzai Zaibao, sssneaker.com, ViiV, SHOWSHOW, michaelwen2008, CONGYOUHUAGE, rabonajersey.com, Customotop, umass1968.com, Jason Bald, Morejersey, zvq4l98f, Macy, Huaxieyoukai, vipjerseydeals.com, sa xi, yzystatic.org, threethreeL, jdrleafs2002, studentsen, Alice sports, Spendtime Here, hongyundastore, kicksvogue.me, buxinqiuhai, 2019sneakersrelease.com, Pigchen, Magic House, gryuowe526e, masked, Superjersey Factory, Ericshu620, Tradeleadercn, Soccer Jersey House, whqlytlyx, dingxuefei, Jerseydhgatecom, wholesalecheapchina.com, LL STORE, beautylish, hotjerseysale.com, zhangzhongliang, Splendid Jerseys Factory, bybygotheway, Chenzheyu, buybuyingoodday, Less and Better, shinereiovnf, yeezybreezy.com, buybuybuy2, Offline Store, Chinese aloe, BAODAN01, kicknove.com, fuyuangyingli, romeholiday2005, xdyo60, soccer jerseys, officialonlineshop.co, nmbisi, isport_jersey, xstock.shop, Meiteyfull Bags, Subban, Wr123456789, dinggev62v, DC Supermarket, jersey_world888, wankaifiyang, Best Goods Trading Co.,ltd, shoeshome, Fan_sport, artemisoutlet.cn, Psgjerseys, Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store, Hdkoco Hockey, elitejerseywholesale.com, adidasschweiz.us, Live, Tukameng2016, yaxing68, Waller, Nice store, babyyu29, qin shao, David Jersey Store, elitejerseysvipwholesale.com, CL store 1, Hedman, sambede-brand, kauee01, storefor.you, bin33asdf, Spriny Muzi, YIGE, guidaohaopeng, outdoorai, Sneakerpop.org, Jerseys_sport and ponuyujh
Case Number: 0:2020cv61146
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re #31 Order upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re #31 Order upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 6, 2020 Filing 33 Clerks Entry of Default as to 2019sneakersrelease.com, Alicesoccer, BAODAN01, Best2018jersey, Best_jerseystore, Buybestgoods, CL store 1, CONGYOUHUAGE, Chinese aloe, Cn-sell, Customotop, DC Supermarket, Davidjersey, Ericshu620, Fan_sport, Gemma_yong, Hdkoco, Hedman, Huaxieyoukai, Jason Bald, Jerseydhgatecom, Jerseys_sport, Jxingwangfs588, LL STORE, Ladies-Fashions, Laine, Less and Better, Linshuai, Magic House, Meiteyfull Bags, Michellelyh511, Morejersey, Nice store, Offline Store, Pigchen, Prosoccer, Psgjerseys, SHOWSHOW, See you again, Sneakerpop.org, Spendtime Here, Spriny Muzi, Subban, Superjerseyfactory, Tradeleadercn, Tukameng2016, ViiV, Waller, Wr123456789, Xiaodouzai Zaibao, YIGE, Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store, adidasschweiz.us, all_star_jerseys, artemisoutlet.cn, babyyu29, beautylish, bin33asdf, buling_buling_store, buxinqiuhai, buybuybuy2, buybuyingoodday, buyitoutlet.com, bybygotheway, dhp_59, dinggev62v, dingxuefei, elitefanaticshop.com, elitejerseyvip.com, elitejerseywholesale.com, fuyuangyingli, gryuowe526e, guidaohaopeng, hongyundastore, hotjerseysale.com, isport_jersey, jdrleafs2002, jersey1234, jersey_world888, jerseycustom, jerseyoutlets, jerseyspromart.com, kauee01, kicknove.com, kicksvogue.me, linduifenqin, michaelwen2008, nmbisi, outdoorai, ponuyujh, qin shao, rabonajersey.com, romeholiday2005, sa xi, sambede-brand, shiguoming, shinereiovnf, shoeshome, sssneaker.com, storefor.you, studentsen, swexb778, threethreeL, umass1968.com, usaexpresss, wankaifiyang, weuquantuiqi, whatsyourdream, wholesalecheapchina.com, whqlytlyx, xdyo60, yaxing68, yecheil.com, yesyeezy.cn, yzystatic.org, zhangzhongliang, zheyu jersey stores, zuixiangqiqing, zvq4l98f - Motions Terminated: #32 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,,,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/6/2020. (ls)
August 5, 2020 Filing 32 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 2019sneakersrelease.com, Alicesoccer, BAODAN01, Best2018jersey, Buybestgoods, CL store 1, CONGYOUHUAGE, Chinese aloe, Cn-sell, Customotop, DC Supermarket, Davidjersey, Ericshu620, Fan_sport, Gemma_yong, Hdkoco, Hedman, Huaxieyoukai, Jason Bald, Jerseydhgatecom, LL STORE, Laine, Linshuai, Meiteyfull Bags, Morejersey, Offline Store, Pigchen, Prosoccer, Sneakerpop.org, Spriny Muzi, Subban, Superjerseyfactory, The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Tradeleadercn, Tukameng2016, Waller, Xiaodouzai Zaibao, YIGE, Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store, adidasschweiz.us, all_star_jerseys, artemisoutlet.cn, babyyu29, beautylish, bin33asdf, buling_buling_store, buxinqiuhai, buybuyingoodday, buyitoutlet.com, bybygotheway, dhp_59, dinggev62v, dingxuefei, elitefanaticshop.com, elitejerseyvip.com, elitejerseywholesale.com, fuyuangyingli, gryuowe526e, guidaohaopeng, hongyundastore, hotjerseysale.com, isport_jersey, jersey1234, jersey_world888, jerseycustom, jerseyoutlets, jerseyspromart.com, kauee01, linduifenqin, michaelwen2008, nmbisi, outdoorai, ponuyujh, qin shao, rabonajersey.com, romeholiday2005, sa xi, sambede-brand, shiguoming, shinereiovnf, storefor.you, studentsen, swexb778, threethreeL, umass1968.com, usaexpresss, wankaifiyang, weuquantuiqi, whatsyourdream, whqlytlyx, xdyo60, yaxing68, yecheil.com, yesyeezy.cn, yzystatic.org, zhangzhongliang, zheyu jersey stores, zuixiangqiqing, zvq4l98f by Adidas International Marketing B.V., Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. See attached document for full details. (fc)
July 14, 2020 Filing 30 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2020 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Appearance(s): Virgilio Gigante, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
July 13, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant wholesalecheapchina.com by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. (Gigante, Virgilio)
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #15 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Adidas International Marketing B.V., Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc.. 2019sneakersrelease.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Alicesoccer served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; BAODAN01 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Best2018jersey served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Best_jerseystore served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Buybestgoods served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; CL store 1 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; CONGYOUHUAGE served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Chinese aloe served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Cn-sell served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Customotop served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; DC Supermarket served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Davidjersey served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Ericshu620 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Fan_sport served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Gemma_yong served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Hdkoco served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Hedman served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Huaxieyoukai served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Jason Bald served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Jerseydhgatecom served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Jerseys_sport served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Jxingwangfs588 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; LL STORE served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Ladies-Fashions served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Laine served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Less and Better served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Linshuai served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Magic House served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Meiteyfull Bags served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Michellelyh511 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Morejersey served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Nice store served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Offline Store served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Pigchen served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Prosoccer served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Psgjerseys served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; SHOWSHOW served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; See you again served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Sneakerpop.org served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Spendtime Here served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Spriny Muzi served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Subban served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Superjerseyfactory served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Tradeleadercn served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Tukameng2016 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; ViiV served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Waller served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Wr123456789 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Xiaodouzai Zaibao served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; YIGE served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; adidasschweiz.us served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; all_star_jerseys served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; artemisoutlet.cn served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; babyyu29 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; beautylish served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; bin33asdf served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; buling_buling_store served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; buxinqiuhai served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; buybuybuy2 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; buybuyingoodday served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; buyitoutlet.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; bybygotheway served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; dhp_59 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; dinggev62v served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; dingxuefei served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; elitefanaticshop.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; elitejerseyvip.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; elitejerseywholesale.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; fuyuangyingli served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; gryuowe526e served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; guidaohaopeng served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; hongyundastore served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; hotjerseysale.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; isport_jersey served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jdrleafs2002 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jersey1234 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jersey_world888 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jerseycustom served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jerseyoutlets served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; jerseyspromart.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; kauee01 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; kicknove.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; kicksvogue.me served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; linduifenqin served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; michaelwen2008 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; nmbisi served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; outdoorai served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; ponuyujh served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; qin shao served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; rabonajersey.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; romeholiday2005 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; sa xi served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; sambede-brand served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; shiguoming served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; shinereiovnf served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; shoeshome served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; sssneaker.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; storefor.you served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; studentsen served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; swexb778 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; threethreeL served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; umass1968.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; usaexpresss served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; wankaifiyang served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; weuquantuiqi served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; whatsyourdream served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; whqlytlyx served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; xdyo60 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; yaxing68 served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; yecheil.com served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; yesyeezy.cn served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; yzystatic.org served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; zhangzhongliang served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; zheyu jersey stores served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; zuixiangqiqing served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020; zvq4l98f served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re #1 Complaint, #9 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified Text on 7/14/2020 (ls).
July 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. of E-mail Inquiries Received from Certain Defendants in connection with Asset Restraint and Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified Text on 7/14/2020 (ls).
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re #10 Sealed Order on Motion, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #12 Notice (Other), #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #3 Form AO 120/121, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 13, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re #1 Complaint, #9 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 13, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing #6 , #7 , #9 , #10 , and #11 pursuant to #22 Order on Motion to Unseal Document (nc)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to elitefanaticshop.com, elitejerseyvip.com. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. re 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents, i.e. elitejerseydeals.com and vipjerseydeals.com (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Customotop. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to 2019sneakersrelease.com, Alicesoccer, BAODAN01, Best2018jersey, Best_jerseystore, Buybestgoods, CL store 1, CONGYOUHUAGE, Chinese aloe, Cn-sell, DC Supermarket, Davidjersey, Ericshu620, Fan_sport, Gemma_yong, Hdkoco, Hedman, Huaxieyoukai, Jason Bald, Jerseydhgatecom, Jerseys_sport, Jxingwangfs588, LL STORE, Ladies-Fashions, Laine, Less and Better, Linshuai, Magic House, Meiteyfull Bags, Michellelyh511, Morejersey, Nice store, Offline Store, Pigchen, Prosoccer, Psgjerseys, SHOWSHOW, See you again, Sneakerpop.org, Spendtime Here, Spriny Muzi, Subban, Superjerseyfactory, Tradeleadercn, Tukameng2016, ViiV, Waller, Wr123456789, Xiaodouzai Zaibao, YIGE, Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store, adidasschweiz.us, all_star_jerseys, artemisoutlet.cn, babyyu29, beautylish, bin33asdf, buling_buling_store, buxinqiuhai, buybuybuy2, buybuyingoodday, buyitoutlet.com, bybygotheway, dhp_59, dinggev62v, dingxuefei, elitejerseywholesale.com, fuyuangyingli, gryuowe526e, guidaohaopeng, hongyundastore, hotjerseysale.com, isport_jersey, jdrleafs2002, jersey1234, jersey_world888, jerseycustom, jerseyoutlets, jerseyspromart.com, kauee01, kicknove.com, kicksvogue.me, linduifenqin, michaelwen2008, nmbisi, outdoorai, ponuyujh, qin shao, rabonajersey.com, romeholiday2005, sa xi, sambede-brand, shiguoming, shinereiovnf, shoeshome, sssneaker.com, storefor.you, studentsen, swexb778, threethreeL, umass1968.com, usaexpresss, wankaifiyang, weuquantuiqi, whatsyourdream, wholesalecheapchina.com, whqlytlyx, xdyo60, yaxing68, yecheil.com, yesyeezy.cn, yzystatic.org, zhangzhongliang, zheyu jersey stores, zuixiangqiqing, zvq4l98f. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Trademarks)(Gigante, Virgilio)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 MOTION to Unseal . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to Unseal Document(s) by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gigante, Virgilio) Modified Relief on 7/7/2020 (ls).
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Bond by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. (cbr)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Filing by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A to Plaintiffs' Complaint) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting; ExParte Motion Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/16/2020. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 16, 2020 Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings : Telephonic Prelinjhrg Hearing set for 7/14/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. per DE #9 (cbr) Modified by Unsealing per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order; granting #6 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Setting a Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/16/2020. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mia Nidia Gutierrez in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit 1 - part 1 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #6 Exhibit 1 - part 2 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #7 Exhibit 1 - part 3 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #8 Exhibit 1 - part 4 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #9 Exhibit 1 - part 5 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #10 Exhibit 1 - part 6 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 7/13/2020 (nc).
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adidas AG, Adidas America Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Adidas America Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (scn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13013883, filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adidas AG et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas International Marketing B.V.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas America Inc.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas AG
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michellelyh511
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hdkoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitefanaticshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jxingwangfs588
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseycustom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zheyu jersey stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buybestgoods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyitoutlet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicesoccer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: swexb778
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidjersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superjerseyfactory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jersey1234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitejerseyvip.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cn-sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linshuai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemma_yong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best_jerseystore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See you again
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: linduifenqin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yecheil.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zuixiangqiqing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buling_buling_store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binnington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies-Fashions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shiguoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best2018jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dhp_59
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: usaexpresss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosoccer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: all_star_jerseys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseyspromart.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yesyeezy.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitejerseydeals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sneakerhead.su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: whatsyourdream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: weuquantuiqi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseyoutlets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maillot De Foot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaodouzai Zaibao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sssneaker.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViiV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOWSHOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michaelwen2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGYOUHUAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rabonajersey.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customotop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: umass1968.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morejersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zvq4l98f
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huaxieyoukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vipjerseydeals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sa xi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yzystatic.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: threethreeL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jdrleafs2002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: studentsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spendtime Here
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hongyundastore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kicksvogue.me
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buxinqiuhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019sneakersrelease.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gryuowe526e
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: masked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superjersey Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericshu620
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeleadercn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soccer Jersey House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: whqlytlyx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dingxuefei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerseydhgatecom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wholesalecheapchina.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beautylish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hotjerseysale.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhangzhongliang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splendid Jerseys Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bybygotheway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chenzheyu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buybuyingoodday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Less and Better
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shinereiovnf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yeezybreezy.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buybuybuy2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offline Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese aloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAODAN01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kicknove.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fuyuangyingli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: romeholiday2005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xdyo60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccer jerseys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: officialonlineshop.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nmbisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: isport_jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xstock.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meiteyfull Bags
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wr123456789
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dinggev62v
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Supermarket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jersey_world888
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wankaifiyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Goods Trading Co.,ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shoeshome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fan_sport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: artemisoutlet.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psgjerseys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogo 's Chinese style grocery store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hdkoco Hockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitejerseywholesale.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasschweiz.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tukameng2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yaxing68
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nice store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: babyyu29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qin shao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jersey Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitejerseysvipwholesale.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CL store 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sambede-brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kauee01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: storefor.you
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bin33asdf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spriny Muzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YIGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guidaohaopeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: outdoorai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sneakerpop.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerseys_sport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ponuyujh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?