Shelton v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nika Yolanda Shelton
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., Josh Henderson, U.S. Corrections, LLC, Josh Baker, PTS of America, LLC, Brevard Extraditions, LLC and Prisoner Transporation Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv61189
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC, Michael Russel as Mediator. (Behar, Aaron)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Nika Yolanda Shelton re #17 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, of Trial Conflict (Frankel, David)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 2/25/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Behar, Aaron)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by PTS of America, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Behar, Aaron)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brevard Extraditions, LLC. (Behar, Aaron)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nika Yolanda Shelton. Brevard Extraditions, LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Frankel, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Daniel W. Olivas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nika Yolanda Shelton. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Frankel, David)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel W. Olivas, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13085661 by Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (Behar, Aaron)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Behar on behalf of Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Attorney Aaron Behar added to party Brevard Extraditions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party PTS of America, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Behar added to party U.S. Corrections, LLC(pty:dft). (Behar, Aaron)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nika Yolanda Shelton. PTS of America, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Frankel, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nika Yolanda Shelton. U.S. Corrections, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Frankel, David)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brevard Extraditions, LLC, PTS of America, LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. (cds)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13037091, filed by Nika Yolanda Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Frankel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Corrections, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTS of America, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brevard Extraditions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transporation Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Represented By: Aaron Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nika Yolanda Shelton
Represented By: David Alan Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?