Bamberg v. The Results Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Bamberg, Shandellah Martin, Amanda Mesot, Stephanie Lowe, Dominique Swanson, Trisha Zimmerman, Aaliyah Wells, Cherokee Wisdom, Heather Wood, Tamia Wells, Kimbra Martin, Parrish Williams, Jessica Lacks, Dana Everett, Pamela D. Brown, Sheri Millner, Shantavia Williams, Erin Elizabeth Marion, Denise M. Rodriguez, Brittney King, Joya Q. Hairston, Beth France, Zachary Cochran, Taylor Dyer, Jaquava Hughes, Jamessa Clark, Yolanda Hannah, Taylor D. Michels, Joshua Baker, Robert Hudson, Amanda James, Clabrone Kent, Kellie C. Michels, Teirra Hairston, Brandon Tarpley, Meredith Perkins, Tasha McKenzie, Kanesha Janae Watkins, Luke Howell, Karen Fripp, Robert Ellington, Joshua Galloway, Leigh Ann Crews, Adam Coleman, Leslie Minter, Marquisha Valentine, Andrea D. Owens, Summar Cooke, Kristopher Kempton, Barbara Campbell, Gracie Luckado, Anhela Willis, Nicole Davis, Jessenia Morales, DeArra Hairston, Jaquisha Howard, Nykema Waller, Kristina Tuggle, Brittney Neblett, Breanna Lanning, Keisha Hargrave, Katlyn Chaney, Erik Willard, Sandra Harris, Terrance Bradner, Fallon Bridges, Alicia Price, Josh Hairston, Karry Keeney, Tabitha Massey, Ashley Gravely, Kathy Conner, Marla Murk, Catrina Harris, Kelly Hicks, Bria Powell, Rebecca Hanks, Brittney M. Jennings, Rebecah S. Gessner, Lisa Orwig, Shana Shipps, Jamyra Giles, Brittany Shelton, Brianna McClearn and Bryson Hairston
Defendant: The Results Companies, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv61420
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot #23 Motion to Compel; denying as moot #23 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #23 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by C. Ryan Morgan on behalf of Pamela D. Brown, Amanda James, Meredith Perkins, Shana Shipps. Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Pamela D. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Amanda James(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Meredith Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Shana Shipps(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Pamela Brown, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Join Amanda James, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Join Meredith Perkins, #4 Exhibit D - Consent to Join Shana Shipps) (Morgan, C.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration of claims of sixty-nine specific plaintiffsDefendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment on claims of six specific plaintiffsDefendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of six specific plaintiffsDefendant's MOTION for More Definite Statement (Alternative) re six specific plaintiffs filed by Joseph Bamberg. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Morgan, C.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 26 Statement of: Material Facts in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Joseph Bamberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Business Records Affidavit)(Morgan, C.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Bamberg.(Morgan, C.)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Referring #23 Motion to Compel Arbitration to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration of claims of sixty-nine specific plaintiffs ( Responses due by 9/8/2020), Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment on claims of six specific plaintiffs ( Responses due by 9/8/2020), Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of six specific plaintiffs, Defendant's MOTION for More Definite Statement (Alternative) re six specific plaintiffs ( Responses due by 9/8/2020) by The Results Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit INDEX TO RELIEF SOUGHT, #2 Exhibit ARBITRATION AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit ARBITRATION AGREEMENT)(Gabrielle, Eric)
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per 22 : The Results Companies, LLC response due 8/24/2020. (lk)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant The Results Companies LLC shall respond to the Complaint by August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/18/2020. (mkz)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by The Results Companies, LLC. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabrielle, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, for Partial Summary Judgment, and for More Definite Statement or Alternatively for Dismissal. Therein, Defendant seeks to compel arbitration of the claims of sixty-nine of the eighty-one plaintiffs in this case. A motion to compel arbitration is not one of the enumerated types of motions exempt from the mandatory conferral requirements of S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion [DE 19] is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to file a motion that complies with the requirements of S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3., which requires the moving party to certify that he has conferred, or describes a reasonable effort to confer, with the parties affected in a good faith effort to resolve the dispute. In the event the Motion is refiled following conferral, it should be styled as a motion to compel arbitration, not as a motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, thereby more clearly indicating the relief requested. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/18/2020. (mkz)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, , MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 9/1/2020), MOTION for More Definite Statement ( Responses due by 9/1/2020), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 9/1/2020) by The Results Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit INDEX TO RELIEF SOUGHT, #2 Exhibit MANDATORY ARBITRATION AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit MANDATORY ARBITRATION AGREEMENT)(Gabrielle, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Statement of: Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by The Results Companies, LLC (Gabrielle, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by The Results Companies, LLC of Filing Declaration of Melissa Mitridis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF MELISSA MITRIDIS) (Gabrielle, Eric)
August 5, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 16 : The Results Companies, LLC response due 8/18/2020. (lk)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 18, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/4/2020. (mkz)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by The Results Companies, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabrielle, Eric) Modified Relief on 8/4/2020 (ls).
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Keith Gabrielle on behalf of The Results Companies, LLC. Attorney Eric Keith Gabrielle added to party The Results Companies, LLC(pty:dft). (Gabrielle, Eric)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by C. Ryan Morgan on behalf of Beth France, Denise M. Rodriguez. Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Beth France(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Denise M. Rodriguez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Beth France, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Denise M. Rodriguez) (Morgan, C.)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Austin W. Anderson ; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney William C. Alexander. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/30/2020. (mkz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joseph Bamberg. The Results Companies, LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Morgan, C.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William C. Alexander. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13262624 by Joseph Bamberg. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Morgan, C.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Austin W. Anderson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13262585 by Joseph Bamberg. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (Morgan, C.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to Parties in FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by C. Ryan Morgan on behalf of Jaquisha Howard, Jessica Lacks, Breanna Lanning, Stephanie Lowe, Gracie Luckado, Erin Elizabeth Marion, Kimbra Martin, Shandellah Martin, Tabitha Massey, Brianna McClearn, Tasha McKenzie, Amanda Mesot, Kellie C. Michels, Taylor D. Michels, Sheri Millner, Leslie Minter, Jessenia Morales, Marla Murk, Brittney Neblett, Lisa Orwig, Andrea D. Owens, Bria Powell, Alicia Price, Brittany Shelton, Dominique Swanson, Brandon Tarpley, Kristina Tuggle, Marquisha Valentine, Nykema Waller, Kanesha Janae Watkins, Aaliyah Wells, Tamia Wells, Erik Willard, Parrish Williams, Shantavia Williams, Anhela Willis, Cherokee Wisdom, Heather Wood, Trisha Zimmerman. Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jaquisha Howard(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jessica Lacks(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Breanna Lanning(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Stephanie Lowe(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Gracie Luckado(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Erin Elizabeth Marion(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kimbra Martin(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Shandellah Martin(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Tabitha Massey(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brianna McClearn(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Tasha McKenzie(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Amanda Mesot(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kellie C. Michels(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Taylor D. Michels(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Sheri Millner(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Leslie Minter(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jessenia Morales(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Marla Murk(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brittney Neblett(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Lisa Orwig(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Andrea D. Owens(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Bria Powell(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Alicia Price(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brittany Shelton(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Dominique Swanson(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brandon Tarpley(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kristina Tuggle(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Marquisha Valentine(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Nykema Waller(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kanesha Janae Watkins(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Aaliyah Wells(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Tamia Wells(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Erik Willard(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Parrish Williams(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Shantavia Williams(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Anhela Willis(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Cherokee Wisdom(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Heather Wood(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Trisha Zimmerman(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join) (Morgan, C.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by C. Ryan Morgan on behalf of Joshua Baker, Terrance Bradner, Fallon Bridges, Barbara Campbell, Katlyn Chaney, Jamessa Clark, Zachary Cochran, Adam Coleman, Kathy Conner, Summar Cooke, Leigh Ann Crews, Nicole Davis, Taylor Dyer, Robert Ellington, Dana Everett, Karen Fripp, Joshua Galloway, Rebecah S. Gessner, Jamyra Giles, Ashley Gravely, Bryson Hairston, DeArra Hairston, Josh Hairston, Joya Q. Hairston, Teirra Hairston, Rebecca Hanks, Yolanda Hannah, Keisha Hargrave, Catrina Harris, Sandra Harris, Kelly Hicks, Luke Howell, Robert Hudson, Jaquava Hughes, Brittney M. Jennings, Kristopher Kempton, Karry Keeney, Clabrone Kent, Brittney King. Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Joshua Baker(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Terrance Bradner(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Fallon Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Barbara Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Katlyn Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jamessa Clark(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Zachary Cochran(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Adam Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kathy Conner(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Summar Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Leigh Ann Crews(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Nicole Davis(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Taylor Dyer(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Robert Ellington(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Dana Everett(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Karen Fripp(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Joshua Galloway(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Rebecah S. Gessner(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jamyra Giles(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Ashley Gravely(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Bryson Hairston(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party DeArra Hairston(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Josh Hairston(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Joya Q. Hairston(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Teirra Hairston(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Rebecca Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Yolanda Hannah(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Keisha Hargrave(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Catrina Harris(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Sandra Harris(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kelly Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Luke Howell(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Robert Hudson(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Jaquava Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brittney M. Jennings(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Kristopher Kempton(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Karry Keeney(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Clabrone Kent(pty:pla), Attorney C. Ryan Morgan added to party Brittney King(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join) (Morgan, C.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Results Companies, LLC. (jbs)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Results Companies, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13177734, filed by Joseph Bamberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Joseph Bamberg, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Morgan, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bamberg v. The Results Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bamberg
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandellah Martin
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mesot
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lowe
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Swanson
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Zimmerman
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaliyah Wells
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Wisdom
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Wood
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamia Wells
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbra Martin
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parrish Williams
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lacks
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Everett
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela D. Brown
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Millner
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantavia Williams
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Elizabeth Marion
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise M. Rodriguez
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney King
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joya Q. Hairston
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth France
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Cochran
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Dyer
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquava Hughes
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamessa Clark
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Hannah
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor D. Michels
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Baker
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hudson
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda James
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clabrone Kent
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie C. Michels
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teirra Hairston
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Tarpley
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Perkins
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha McKenzie
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanesha Janae Watkins
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Howell
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fripp
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellington
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Galloway
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Ann Crews
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Coleman
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Minter
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquisha Valentine
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea D. Owens
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summar Cooke
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kempton
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Campbell
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie Luckado
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anhela Willis
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Davis
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessenia Morales
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeArra Hairston
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquisha Howard
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nykema Waller
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Tuggle
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Neblett
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Lanning
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Hargrave
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katlyn Chaney
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Willard
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Harris
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Bradner
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fallon Bridges
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Price
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Hairston
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karry Keeney
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Massey
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gravely
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Conner
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Murk
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Harris
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hicks
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bria Powell
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Hanks
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney M. Jennings
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecah S. Gessner
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Orwig
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Shipps
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamyra Giles
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Shelton
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna McClearn
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryson Hairston
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Results Companies, LLC
Represented By: Eric Keith Gabrielle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?