Davis v. Inch
Plaintiff: Leroy Davis
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 0:2020cv61446
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The appointment of counsel in civil cases is not a constitutional right but a privilege that is justified only by exceptional circumstances, such as where the facts and legal issues are so novel or complex as to require the assistance of a trained practitioner. Poole v. Lambert, 819 F.2d 1025, 1028 (11th Cir. 1987). This rule extends to postconviction collateral attacks. Pennsylvania v. Finley, 481 U.S. 551, 555 (1987). Since preliminary review of the record reveals that an evidentiary hearing is not required in this case, the appointment of counsel is not mandatory, nor do the interests of justice require such an appointment at this time. See Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases Rule 8(c); see McGriff v. Dept. of Corrections, 338 F.3d 1231 (11th Cir. 2003). No such exceptional circumstances exist here to justify the appointment of counsel at this juncture. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2020. (er00)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $5.00. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2020. (er00)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Leroy Davis. Responses due by 7/31/2020 (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leroy Davis. (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Leroy Davis.(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?