Williams v. Dynaserv Florida LLC
Plaintiff: Jesus Williams
Defendant: Dynaserv Florida LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv61454
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #9 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Vacate the #7 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/2/2020. (kge)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #7 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default by Dynaserv Florida LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trigo, Capri)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Capri Trigo on behalf of Dynaserv Florida LLC. Attorney Capri Trigo added to party Dynaserv Florida LLC(pty:dft). (Trigo, Capri)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to DYNASERV FLORIDA, LLC - Motions Terminated: #6 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/18/2020. (dj) Modified text as per DE 10 on 9/3/2020 (lk).
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dynaserv Florida LLC by Jesus Williams. (Blumstein, Jake)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jesus Williams (Blumstein, Jake)
July 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Williams. Dynaserv Florida LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Richards, Jordan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dynaserv Florida LLC. (drz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Dynaserv Florida LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13200489, filed by Jesus Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to Dynaserv Florida LLC)(Richards, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Dynaserv Florida LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Williams
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Represented By: Melissa Jane Scott
Represented By: Jake Slome Blumstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynaserv Florida LLC
Represented By: Capri Trigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?