Bruchim et al v. Zaky et al
Plaintiff: Cosmetics 4 Less Inc., Gad Bruchim and MBNS Inc.
Defendant: Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Hany Zaky, Gabriela Dabdoub and Monica Dabdoub
Case Number: 0:2020cv61459
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non- Dispositive Matters. Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis no longer assigned as referral judge in case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (aw)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 9/7/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2021., Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2020., Mediation Deadline 4/15/2021., In Limine Motions due by 8/13/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 4/13/2021., Motions due by 8/13/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/13/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Compliance with Rule 26 Disclosures by Gad Bruchim, Cosmetics 4 Less Inc., MBNS Inc. (Balkin, Helana)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Gad Bruchim, Cosmetics 4 Less Inc., MBNS Inc. (Balkin, Helana)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/8/2020 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky re #4 Notice (Other), 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Corrected to Attach Proper Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky. (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Monica Dabdoub Consenting to Removal by Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Gabriela Dabdoub Consenting to Removal by Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by DabZak Global Distribution LLC Consenting to Removal by Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Best Kept Beauty Secrets Consenting to Removal by Hany Zaky (Romaguera, Christian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Best Kept Beauty Secrets, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, Hany Zaky of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Romaguera, Christian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Gad Bruchim, MBNS Inc., and Cosmetics 4 Less Inc. v. Hany Zaky, Gabriela Dabdoub, Monica Dabdoub, DabZak Global Distribution LLC, and Best Kept Beauty Secrets) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number BFLSDC-13207319, filed by Hany Zaky. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit eSummons for Hany Zaky, #5 Exhibit eSummons for DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #6 Exhibit eSummons for Gabriela Dabdoub, #7 Exhibit eSummons for Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #8 Exhibit eSummons for Monica Dabdoub, #9 Exhibit Clerk's Certificate of Compliance, #10 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Gabriela Dabdoub, #12 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #13 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Monica Dabdoub, #14 Exhibit Affidavit of Military Service on Gabriela Dabdoub, #15 Exhibit Affidavit of Military Service on DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #16 Exhibit Motion for Entry of a Default on Gabriela Dabdoub, #17 Exhibit Motion for Entry of a Default on DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #18 Exhibit Clerk's Default on Gabriela Dabdoub, #19 Exhibit Clerk's Default on DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #20 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment on Gabriela Dabdoub, #21 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment on DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #22 Exhibit Affidavit of Damages as to DabZak Global Distribution LLC, #23 Exhibit Affidavit of Damages as to Gabriela Dabdoub, #24 Exhibit Motion to Extend Time for Service, #25 Exhibit Order to Extend Time, #26 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #27 Exhibit Affidavit of Military Service on Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #28 Exhibit Affidavit of Military Service on Monica Dabdoub, #29 Exhibit Motion for Entry of a Default on Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #30 Exhibit Motion for Entry of a Default on Monica Dabdoub, #31 Exhibit Clerk's Default on Monica Dabdoub, #32 Exhibit Clerk's Default on Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #33 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment on Monica Dabdoub, #34 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment on Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #35 Exhibit Default Final Judgment against Monica Dabdoub, #36 Exhibit Default Final Judgment against Best Kept Beauty Secrets, #37 Exhibit Notice of Unavailability, #38 Exhibit Notice of Hearing Set by Judge, #39 Exhibit Notice of Appearance on Behalf of All Defendants, #40 Exhibit Amended Notice of Appearance on Behalf of All Defendants, #41 Exhibit Agreed Order Vacating Default Final Judgments and Clerks' Defaults, and Permitting the Defendants to File Timely Response to the Plaintiffs' Complaint, #42 Exhibit Waiver and Acceptance of Service of Process, #43 Exhibit Notice of Full Appearance on Behalf of Hany Zaky)(Romaguera, Christian) Text Modified on 7/20/2020 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruchim et al v. Zaky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Kept Beauty Secrets
Represented By: Christian Charles Romaguera
Represented By: Raul Romaguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DabZak Global Distribution LLC
Represented By: Christian Charles Romaguera
Represented By: Raul Romaguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hany Zaky
Represented By: Christian Charles Romaguera
Represented By: Raul Romaguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriela Dabdoub
Represented By: Christian Charles Romaguera
Represented By: Raul Romaguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Dabdoub
Represented By: Christian Charles Romaguera
Represented By: Raul Romaguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosmetics 4 Less Inc.
Represented By: Helana Elise Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gad Bruchim
Represented By: Helana Elise Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MBNS Inc.
Represented By: Helana Elise Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?