Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel
Plaintiff: Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel
Claimant: 760 Taylor Lane, LLC d/b/a Playboy Marine
Case Number: 0:2020cv61601
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION. ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Monition issue out of and under the seal of this Court against all persons and corporation claiming damage for any and all loss, destruction, damage, injuries, and/or death allegedly as a result of the occurrence and happenings recited in the Complaint, to file their respective claims with the Clerk of Court and so serve on or mail to the attorneys for Petitioners copies thereof by 11/5/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by 760 Taylor Lane, LLC d/b/a Playboy Marine re #7 Answer to Complaint Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Contract of Agreement) (Hurley, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time TO EXTEND MONITION DEADLINE by Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel. Responses due by 10/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sioli, Frank)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Claim by 760 Taylor Lane, LLC d/b/a Playboy Marine. Attorney James Norford Hurley added to party 760 Taylor Lane, LLC d/b/a Playboy Marine(pty:clm). (Hurley, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel PETITIONER'S NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY MONITION AND INJUNCTION (Sioli, Frank)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION. ORDER approving #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) Text Modified on 8/18/2020 (amb).
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LIMITATION INJUNCTION, MONITION AND ORDER APPROVING PETITIONER'S SECURITY by Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Sioli, Frank)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sioli, Frank)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against All Parties. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13308342, filed by Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Sioli, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schubert and Hattatude Sportfishing Charters, Inc. as Owner of/and as Operator/Vessel/Manager of M/V Hattatude, Hatteras Vessel
Represented By: Frank Joseph Sioli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 760 Taylor Lane, LLC d/b/a Playboy Marine
Represented By: James Norford Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?