Quamina v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Quamina
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., Merscorp Holdings Inc., La Salle Bank N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, JP Morgan Chase and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61637
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
2 Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS #20 Notice (Other), #21 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, Response in Opposition to Corrected Motion with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bank of America N.A.. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Difato, Brittney)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT/CORRECTED MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Bank of America N.A., JP Morgan Chase, La Salle Bank N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Barbara Quamina.(mc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Correction Removing Merscorp Holdings as Respondent in Motion to Confirm the Arbitration Award by Barbara Quamina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (mc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #9 Mescorp Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Confirmation of Final Arbitration Award. Plaintiff shall file a response to #9 Mescorp Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Confirmation of Final Arbitration Award by no later than September 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/16/2020. (co)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America N.A. (Difato, Brittney)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Confirmation of Final Arbitration Award as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award or Alternative Response in Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Barbara Quamina. (mee)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase (Israel, Kimberly)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award Joinder in MERSCORP Holding, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Alternative Response in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (Israel, Kimberly)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Held Israel on behalf of JP Morgan Chase. Attorney Kimberly Held Israel added to party JP Morgan Chase(pty:dft). (Israel, Kimberly)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Difato, Brittney)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara F. Holladay-Tobias on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. Attorney Sara F. Holladay-Tobias added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft). (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brittney Lauren Difato on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. Attorney Brittney Lauren Difato added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft). (Difato, Brittney)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merscorp Holdings Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Merscorp Holdings Inc. (Israel, Kimberly)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award or Alternative Response in Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Merscorp Holdings Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Orders)(Israel, Kimberly)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Held Israel on behalf of Merscorp Holdings Inc.. Attorney Kimberly Held Israel added to party Merscorp Holdings Inc.(pty:dft). (Israel, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Raag Singhal recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/12/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100213431 (asz)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Barbara Quamina re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award (jao)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by Barbara Quamina. (jao)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Barbara Quamina re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by Barbara Quamina (jao)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm Arbitration Award. Filing fee $400.00(PAID), filed by Barbara Quamina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jao) Modified on 8/12/2020 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quamina v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Held Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Salle Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: Kimberly Held Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay
Represented By: Brittney Lauren Difato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Quamina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?