Sea Gryphon, LLC v. Kaspereit
Plaintiff: Sea Gryphon, LLC
Defendant: Claude Kaspereit
Case Number: 0:2020cv61657
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of Order mailed to defendant) re #8 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant (mee)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Claude Kaspereit (mee)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Sea Gryphon, LLC of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Fiorilli, Justin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Claude Kaspereit, (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Claude Kaspereit. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13368160, filed by Sea Gryphon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase and Sale Contract, #2 Summon(s))(Fiorilli, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Gryphon, LLC v. Kaspereit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Kaspereit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Gryphon, LLC
Represented By: Justin Scott Fiorilli
Represented By: Danielle Justine Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?