Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv61666
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 11/9/2020 (ls)(per DE #12)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #11 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss by November 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/5/2020. (kge)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liggio, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company (DePiano, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (DePiano, David)
September 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 9/25/2020 Per DE#8. (cqs)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #7 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/9/2020. (kge)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney David J. DePiano added to party Aetna Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(DePiano, David)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert J. Axelrod may appear before this Court on behalf of Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC, for all purposes relating to the proceedings in this matter. The Clerk shall provide notice of electronic filings to Robert J. Axelrod at rjaxelrod@axelrodllp.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 9/1/2020. (hhr)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert J. Axelrod. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13416966 by Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Liggio, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC. (Liggio, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-13370404, payment transferred from : 9:20-cv-81342 Vanguard vs. Aetna, filed by Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Liggio, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanguard Aesthetic Plastic Surgery, PLLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Liggio
Represented By: Robert J. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. DePiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?