Morales, et al v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Sergio Morales and Christina Morales
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 0:2020cv61674
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 12/3/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020., Discovery due by 8/6/2021., Expert Discovery due by 8/6/2021., Fact Discovery due by 7/2/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2020., Mediation Deadline 8/20/2021., In Limine Motions due by 9/3/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2021., Motions due by 9/3/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/23/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 8/20/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Fischler, Jeremy)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Fischler, Jeremy)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/24/2020. (eca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Clerk Added Missing Party. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - SERGIO MORALES & CHRISTINA MORALES v. GEOVERA SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13376172, filed by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Fischler, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales, et al v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Morales
Represented By: Travis Greene
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Basco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeremy Brett Fischler
Represented By: William Jacob Peterfriend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?