Myeress v. Greg's Recovery Group LLC
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Greg's Recovery Group LLC Greg's Recovery Group LLC dba Potential Life Recovery doing business as Potential Life Recovery and Greg's Recovery Group LLC doing business as Potential Life Recovery
Case Number: 0:2020cv61708
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Administratively Closing Case upon Notice of Settlement.Responses due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Wirth, Craig)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Plaintiff's complaint. #11 . The response is now due October 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Greg's Recovery Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Levine, Justin)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to respond to the Plaintiff's complaint. #9 . The Defendant's response is now due October 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to the Complaint by Greg's Recovery Group LLC. Attorney Justin B. Levine added to party Greg's Recovery Group LLC(pty:dft). (Levine, Justin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Greg's Recovery Group LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Wirth, Craig)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/10/2020. (jz)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (pcs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greg's Recovery Group LLC. (pcs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Greg's Recovery Group LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13392512, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Greg's Recovery Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg's Recovery Group LLC Greg's Recovery Group LLC dba Potential Life Recovery doing business as Potential Life Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg's Recovery Group LLC doing business as Potential Life Recovery
Represented By: Justin B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Meir Teitelbaum
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?