Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc. v. Learjet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Michael McBride, Jr., Kalas Burkule and Learjet, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Bombardier Aircraft Services
Case Number: 0:2020cv61963
Filed: September 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to District Judge Aileen M Cannon for all further proceedings, Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
November 23, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Notice (Other),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Work Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
November 23, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT NOTICE SCHEDULING MEDIATION Selected/Added Scott J. Silverman as Mediator. (Torricella, Roberto) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (ebz).
November 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Striking #24 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Scott J. Silverman by Learjet, Inc. (Torricella, Roberto)
November 23, 2020 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (jas)
November 23, 2020 Filing 24 STRICKEN Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Scott J. Silverman as Mediator. (Torricella, Roberto) Modified per DE#26 Notice of Striking on 11/24/2020 (ebz).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's motion for extension. Plaintiff shall file a reply in further support of its motion to remand by no later than November 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/18/2020. (clu)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaden, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension. Defendants shall file their reply in support of the motion to dismiss by no later than November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/13/2020. (clu)
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. Replies due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Aaron Disney)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Defendants shall file their reply by no later than November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/3/2020. (clu)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion to remand by no later than November 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/30/2020. (clu)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 MOTION to Remand by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Notice (Other),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.. Replies due by 11/3/2020. (Zaden, Richard)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/3/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 12/28/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss by no later than November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/20/2020. (clu)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Notice (Other),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.. (Zaden, Richard)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Zaden, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Roberto Villamil)(Zaden, Richard)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Notice (Other),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Work Order, #2 Exhibit B - Learjet Proposal)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/7/2020. (dpr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents by Learjet, Inc. re #5 Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Search for prior case, #4 Exhibit 4 - eSummons Issuance to McBride, #5 Exhibit 5 - eSummons Issuance to Burkule, #6 Exhibit 6 - eSummons Issuance to Bombardier, #7 Exhibit 7 - eSummons Issuance to Learjet, #8 Exhibit 8 - First Request for Production, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons Returned Served on Burkule, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons Returned Served on Bombardierv, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons Returned Served on Learjet, #12 Exhibit 12 - Updated and Revised First Request for Production) (Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (on Removal) by Learjet, Inc. (Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Kalas Burkule, Learjet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters and Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Negligence et al) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13591158, filed by Learjet, Inc.. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B- Verified Statement of Michael McBride, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Kalas Burkule, #4 Exhibit D - Consents to Removal)(Baumgarten, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc. v. Learjet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McBride, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalas Burkule
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Learjet, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Bombardier Aircraft Services
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empresas Puertorriquenas De Desarrollo, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Zaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?