HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE v. EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE and International Insurance Company of Hanover SE
Defendant: EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Case Number: 0:2020cv62029
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Dominic Brandy Notice of Mediation (Brandy, Dominic)
November 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Dominic Brandy. Mediation Hearing set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM via videoconferencing service. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Dominic Brandy as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/10/2021 at 10 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ryan)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. Any discovery motions filed shall include a certification of conferral that indicates specifically that conferral in person or by phone was performed but unsuccessful. Leaving messages shall not satisfy this Court's requirement of a meaningful conferral. FURTHER, Counsel is unable to file any discovery motions without obtaining permission from Chambers first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (bse)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Doug Skierski, may appear and participate in this action on behalf of HDI Global Specialty SE f/k/a International Insurance Company of Hannover SE as subrogee of Sims Crane Equipment Co. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Doug Skierski, at DSkierski@SkiJain.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/5/2020. (bse)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Doug Skierski. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-13812686 by HDI Global Specialty SE. Responses due by 11/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Doug Skierski, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Maranges, Matthew)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Maranges on behalf of HDI Global Specialty SE (Maranges, Matthew)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Calendar Call set for 11/2/2021 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2020. Discovery due by 7/13/2021. Expert Discovery due by 7/13/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/21/2020. Mediation Deadline 7/27/2021. In Limine Motions due by 10/25/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2021. Motions due by 8/4/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/25/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Amended SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Burns, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Burns, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent PLH GROUP, INC. for EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Burns, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Burns, Ryan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Ryan D. Burns re #6 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Ryan D. Burns has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan D. Burns (Burns, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/22/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES., ( Removal Status Report due by 10/19/2020.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand FOR TRIAL by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.. (Burns, Ryan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13641909, filed by EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Removal - Complaint (State Court), #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B" to Removal - Summons to Edison (State Court), #4 Exhibit Exhibit "B" to Removal - Verified Return of Service (State Court), #5 Appendix Clerk's Certificate of Compliance (State Court), #6 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet (State Court), #7 Docket Sheet (State Court))(Burns, Ryan) Text Modified on 10/6/2020 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE v. EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Matthew Maranges
Represented By: Doug Skierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Insurance Company of Hanover SE
Represented By: Matthew Maranges
Represented By: Doug Skierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDISON POWER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?