Appelbaum et al v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Darrow, Linda Hall, Kenaope Rutang and Jane Appelbaum
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Alza Corporation, IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION, Ivax LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C., Ivax Corporation, Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC, Ivax Laboratories Inc., Ivax Research LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ivax Research Inc. and ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 0:2020cv62068
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #8 and #9 Motions for Extension of Time in light of 10 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/22/2020. (eyr)
November 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Deadlines in this case are stayed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/22/2020. (eyr)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Alza Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attorney David J. Walz added to party Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walz, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. Attorney Daniel Jay Gerber added to party Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerber, Daniel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Alza Corporation, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attorney David J. Walz added to party Alza Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Janssen Research & Development LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Walz added to party ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit B - Stay Orders)(Walz, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Susan Stanfill Carlson (Carlson, Susan)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Pursuant to Southern District of Florida CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedure 3I(6), all proposed orders must be e-mailed in Word format (.doc or.docx) to the division e-mail address at Singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/13/2020. (eyr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alza Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,, Ivax LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. (pcs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13669280, filed by Kenaope Rutang, Linda Hall, Jane Appelbaum, Dawn Darrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s))(Widlanski, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appelbaum et al v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Research LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Research Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Darrow
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Camille Mullenax
Represented By: Susan Stanfill Carlson
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hall
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Camille Mullenax
Represented By: Susan Stanfill Carlson
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenaope Rutang
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Camille Mullenax
Represented By: Susan Stanfill Carlson
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Appelbaum
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Camille Mullenax
Represented By: Susan Stanfill Carlson
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?