Caturano v. Armchem International Corp.
Plaintiff: John Caturano
Defendant: Armchem International Corp.
Case Number: 0:2020cv62359
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 36 Second MOTION TO DISMISS #3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Caturano. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Turner, John)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Trial set for 1/3/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 12/31/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 23, 2020 Filing 34 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by John Caturano (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 33 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by John Caturano (Turner, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 32 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by John Caturano (Turner, John)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Andrew E. Bollinger. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/10/2020. (mp00)
December 9, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew E. Bollinger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14005835 by John Caturano. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, John)
December 9, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Anthony Turner on behalf of John Caturano. Attorney John Anthony Turner added to party John Caturano(pty:pla). (Turner, John)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jonthan H. Dunlap representing Armchem International Corp. (Defendant) and Armchem International Corp. (Counter Claimant); Attorney Stephen B. Williamson representing Armchem International Corp. (Defendant) and Armchem International Corp. (Counter Claimant); withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jonthan Dunlap, Stephen Williamson. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 4, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jonathan Dunlap and Stephen Williamson for / by Armchem International Corp.. Attorney Oscar E. Soto added to party Armchem International Corp.(pty:cc). Responses due by 12/18/2020 (Soto, Oscar)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 19, 2020 Filing 25 Amended NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar E. Soto on behalf of Armchem International Corp. (Soto, Oscar) Text Modified on 11/19/2020 (cds).
November 19, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar E. Soto on behalf of Armchem International Corp.. Attorney Oscar E. Soto added to party Armchem International Corp.(pty:dft). (Soto, Oscar)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jonathan H. Dunlap, Stephen B. Williamson, and John Michael Moye, mailing date November 19, 2020, (pt)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from North Carolina Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00173. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Rule 26 Obligations by Armchem International Corp.. Replies due by 10/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dunlap, Jonathan)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Change Venue. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 10/13/2020. (reh)
October 14, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Specific Document (Appeal) due by 10/28/2020. (reh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Rule 26 Obligations by John Caturano. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Subpoena to Momar), #2 Memorandum) (Moye, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Change Venue by Armchem International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. 1st Supplemental Declaration of Marganelli, #2 Exhibit B. 1st Supplemental Declaration of Mantro, #3 Exhibit C. 1st Supplemental Declaration of Brahms)(Dunlap, Jonathan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Change Venue by John Caturano. Replies due by 9/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Caturano, #2 Exhibit 2 -Declaration of Jeff Kempton, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ben Denson)(Moye, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Caturano. (Moye, John)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Caturano's deadline to file a reply brief in support of his Motion to Dismiss is 9/8/2020. Defendant Armchem's reply brief in support of its Motion to Transfer is due 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/31/2020. (maf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Change Venue , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Caturano. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moye, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Armchem International Corp.. Replies due by 9/2/2020 (Dunlap, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Change Venue by Armchem International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Certificate of Auth of Records, #2 Exhibit 2. Declaration of Mantro, #3 Exhibit 3. Declaration of Marganelli, #4 Exhibit 4. Declaration of Brahms, #5 Exhibit 5. Case Statistics)(Dunlap, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue by Armchem International Corp.. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Dunlap, Jonathan). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Caturano. Responses due by 8/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Moye, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal,, Counterclaim, by John Caturano.(Moye, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Dunlap on behalf of Armchem International Corp. (Dunlap, Jonathan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition Motion to Transfer contained in #3 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal, Counterclaim by John Caturano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Caturano, #2 Exhibit 2 -Declaration of Jeff Kempton, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ben Denson)(Moye, John) Modified text on 7/28/2020. (khm)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal, Counterclaim. John Caturano answer to counterclaim due 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/22/2020. (ni)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal,, Counterclaim, by John Caturano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moye, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, COUNTERCLAIM against John Caturano by Armchem International Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Noncompetition, Nonsolicitation and Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit B. Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit C. W9, #4 Exhibit D. May 12, 2020 Cease and Desist Letter)(Williamson, Stephen) Modified text on 7/28/2020. (khm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armchem International Corp. (Williamson, Stephen)
July 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
July 7, 2020 Set Deadlines: Deadline for Armchem International Corp. to respond to the Complaint is 7/13/2020. (maf)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NC Superior Court of Buncombe County, case number 20CV01793. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4561713), filed by Armchem International Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Williamson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caturano v. Armchem International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armchem International Corp.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Represented By: Oscar E. Soto
Represented By: Jonthan H. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caturano
Represented By: John Michael Moye
Represented By: Andrew E. Bollinger
Represented By: John Anthony Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?