Albert v. National Security Agency et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Albert
Defendant: National Security Agency and United States National Security Agency
Consolidated Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Case Number: 0:2020cv62652
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #47 the Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/18/2021. (drd)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #46 the Plaintiff's Motion for a "Permanent Restraining Order." See Order to Show Cause #27 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/18/2021. (drd)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #45 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Recusal or Disqualification. This is the fifth such motion - all of them frivolous. The Court now warns the Plaintiff that any future frivolous motions may result in sanctions, which could include a monetary fine or a restriction on filing privileges. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/18/2021. (drd)
February 17, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery by Benjamin Albert. ( Responses due by 3/3/2021) (kpe)
February 17, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Permanent Restraining Order by Benjamin Albert. Responses due by 3/3/2021. (kpe)
February 17, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION for Reconsideration by Successor After Disqualification by Benjamin Albert. (kpe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2021: #1 Memorandum Memorandum, #2 Affidavit for Reconsideration) (kpe).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #43 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Recusal or Disqualification. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/16/2021. (drd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Reconsideration by Successor After Disqualification by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit)(kpe)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #41 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Recusal or Disqualification. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/12/2021. (drd)
February 11, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Reconsideration by Successor After Recusal or Disqualification, by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit)(kpe)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #38 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Recusal or Disqualification. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/4/2021. (drd)
February 4, 2021 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense, United States National Security Agency, filed by Benjamin Albert.(kpe)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 3, 2021 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Appeal for Reconsideration by Successor after Recusal or Disqualification of the Altman Hunt Setup re 36 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Recusal, by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(apz)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #35 Motion for Reconsideration and Recusal. The Plaintiff says he wants to pursue a "multiple trial strategy." The two cases were consolidated "without prejudice to any party filing a future motion for separate trials under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b)." See Order Consolidating Cases #31 . As such, the Plaintiff may renew his motion closer to trial. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/1/2021. (drd)
January 29, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Reconsideration and Recusal by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Reconsideration and Recusal)(kpe)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER In Cases With Multiple Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 28, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (kpe)
January 28, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed. National Security Agency served on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (kpe)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Consolidating Cases. Case Number 21-cv-60161-RKA is hereby CONSOLIDATED into Case No. 20-cv-62652-RKA. Case Number 21-cv-60161-RKA shall be administratively CLOSED. All future filings shall be made under Albert v. National Security Agency, 20-cv-62652-RKA. Any pending motions in Case Numbers 20-cv-62652 and 21-cv-60161-RKA are DENIED AS MOOT. (Complaint due by 2/2/2021) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) .
January 27, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cost Worksheet)(kpe)
January 26, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Filing Background by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE On Order to Consolidate re #27 Order, by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(kpe)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance re #23 Summons Issued as to USA, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis(Package sent to US Marshalls for service) (amb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to National Security Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (amb)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #20 Motion for Temporary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/14/2021. (drd)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #19 Motion for Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/14/2021. (drd)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Security Agency, filed by Benjamin Albert.(kpe)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Expedited Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/11/2021. (drd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Expedited Injunction Hearing and Discovery by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Benjamin Albert. (kpe)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (kpe)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Summons, complaint, and order forwarded to Marshal's for service. (cbr)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to National Security Agency. (cbr)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance re 8 Order. Summons and Complaints sent to U.S. Marshal for service. (kpe)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to National Security Agency. (kpe)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Benjamin Albert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/29/2020. (hhr)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Benjamin Albert to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Ba13c@protonmail.com (amb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental COMPLAINT against National Security Agency, filed by Benjamin Albert.(amb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (jbs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Albert. (jbs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Security Agency. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Benjamin Albert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(jbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert v. National Security Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Security Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?