MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC et al v. OR MANIA USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC, CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC and MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC
Defendant: OR MANIA USA, INC., OR MANIA LTD., OREN IFRAH, OFER HAZUT, MICHEL ROGOF and RONIT HAIMOVITCH
Case Number: 0:2021cv60054
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC Of Serving Certified Translated Documents (Murray, Jason)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC (Murray, Jason)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. RONIT HAIMOVITCH waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. OREN IFRAH waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. OR MANIA LTD. waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. OFER HAZUT waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. MICHEL ROGOF waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. OR MANIA USA, INC. waiver sent on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Murray, Jason)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OFINTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/26/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to RONIT HAIMOVITCH. (drz)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to OFER HAZUT. (drz)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MICHEL ROGOF. (drz)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to OREN IFRAH. (drz)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Oren Ifrah, #2 Summon(s) Michel Rogof, #3 Summon(s) Ofer Hazut, #4 Summon(s) Ronit Haimovitch) (Murray, Jason)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to OR MANIA LTD., OR MANIA USA, INC. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Summonses. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFER HAZUT, OREN IFRAH, OR MANIA LTD., OR MANIA USA, INC., MICHEL ROGOF, RONIT HAIMOVITCH. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14181843, filed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC, NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC, NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC, NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC, NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit)(Murray, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/11/2021) (drz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #34 Civil Cover Sheet) (drz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #35 Summon(s)) (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC et al v. OR MANIA USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OR MANIA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OR MANIA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OREN IFRAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFER HAZUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEL ROGOF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONIT HAIMOVITCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIOR PEREZ
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIA FLORIDA MALL, LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOIZZ PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOIZZ TOPANGA MALL, LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET INTERNATIONAL DR. LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOIZZ FLORIDA MALL, LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOIZZ SAWGRASS MILLS, LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIA RETAIL U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIA TOPANGA MALL LLC
Represented By: Jason Monroe Murray
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?