Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. v. B&C Wash Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. d/b/a Superior Wash and Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. doing business as Superior Wash
Defendant: Cesar R. Reyes and B&C Wash Corp.
Case Number: 0:2021cv60351
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal by April 10, 2021. All pending deadlines and hearings are TERMINATED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling Hearing set for 3/11/2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Hunt based upon the Parties' Notice of Settlement #21 . Further, as requested by the Parties, the Temporary Restraining Order shall be extended until 3/18/2021. The Parties shall file a stipulated consent injunction on or before 3/18/2021, as represented in the Notice of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/11/2021. (bse)
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. (Blynn, Aaron)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Zoom Information for the Hearing Set on 3/11/2021 at 2:30 p.m. is as follows: Meeting ID: 160 461 6642 Password: 4343. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/9/2021. (bse)
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. B&C Wash Corp. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Blynn, Aaron)
March 3, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. Cesar R. Reyes served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Blynn, Aaron)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER Resetting Hearing on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Zoom Hearing is reset for 3/11/2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/1/2021. (bse)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER Extending the Temporary Restraining Order at Plaintiff's request and upon the representation that Plaintiff is engaged in settlement discussions with Defendants. The Temporary Restraining Order shall be extended to March 11, 2021. No further extensions will be granted. A separate order resetting the hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/1/2021. (bse)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER. The hearing scheduled on 3/1/2021 at 10:00 a.m. shall be held through Zoom. The Zoom information is as follows: Meeting ID: 160 248 6530 Passcode: 4343. The Parties shall contact Chambers immediately if they experience any difficulty accessing the Zoom hearing. Plaintiff shall provide Defendants with this information immediately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/24/2021. (bse)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction : Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 3/1/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. At that time, the Parties shall call (888) 273-3658 to attend the conference and enter the access code 6319427 followed by the # symbol. The Parties should contact Chambers immediately, (954) 769-5470, if they experience any difficulties accessing the conference. Zoom information may be provided by the Court at a later time. Plaintiff shall immediately serve Defendants with #13 this Court's Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/17/2021. (bse)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (bse)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Susan E. Tegt may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc., d/b/a Superior Wash. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Susan E. Tegt at stegt@larkinhoffman.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/17/2021. (bse)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James M. Susag may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc., d/b/a Superior Wash. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to James M. Susag, at jsusag@larkinhoffman.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/17/2021. (bse)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. The Plaintiff(s) in this case shall file proof of service, as to each Defendant, within seven days of perfecting service on each Defendant. The Defendants shall file their responses and motions jointly. But they may file separate answers. Failure to comply with these procedures may result in sanctions, including the striking of the motion(s) or response(s). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: United States Magistrate Judge Hunt shall issue an Order on the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Report and Recommendations on the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/16/2021. (drd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Susan E. Tegt. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14393279 by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blynn, Aaron)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Susag. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14393204 by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blynn, Aaron)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #5 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for a Report and Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and S.D. Fla. L. R. Magistrate Judge Rule1(d)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/16/2021. (drd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 3/2/2021), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Blynn, Aaron)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James M. Susag, Susan E. Tegt, mailing date February 16, 2021, (pt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B&C Wash Corp., Cesar R. Reyes. (amb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14381631, filed by Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. d/b/a Superior Wash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s) B&C Wash Corp, #7 Summon(s) Cesar R. Reyes)(Blynn, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. v. B&C Wash Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar R. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&C Wash Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. d/b/a Superior Wash
Represented By: Aaron Seth Blynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-County Mobile Wash, Inc. doing business as Superior Wash
Represented By: Aaron Seth Blynn
Represented By: James M. Susag
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Represented By: Susan E. Tegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?