Kimera Labs, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kimera Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Larry Faulkner, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and LARRY FAULKNER, LLP
Case Number: 0:2021cv61042
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 1/3/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 6/20/2022 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 6/14/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2021., Expert Discovery due by 1/14/2022., Fact Discovery due by 1/14/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2021., Mediation Deadline 1/3/2022., In Limine Motions due by 5/20/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2022., Motions due by 5/20/2022., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/20/2022), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 Clerks Entry of Default as to Larry Faulkner - Motions Terminated: #11 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/29/2021. (ebz)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Default Judgment by Kimera Labs, Inc.. (Weinberg, John)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule, #2 Exhibit B - Election to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge)(Lechich, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kimera Labs, Inc.. Larry Faulkner served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Weinberg, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Counter/Cross-Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Larry Faulkner. (ebz)
May 25, 2021 Attorney Brian John Lechich representing Faulkner, Larry (Defendant) and Faulkner, Larry (Cross Defendant) terminated. Attorney Added in error. Attorney does not represent Defendant or Cross Defendant. (ebz)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , CROSSCLAIM against Larry Faulkner, COUNTERCLAIM against Kimera Labs, Inc. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Lechich, Brian)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Correction to Civil Docket Sheet (Lechich, Brian)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/21/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14693718, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. No Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket and Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechich, Brian)(ebz). Modified text on 5/25/2021 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimera Labs, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Faulkner
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY FAULKNER, LLP
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimera Labs, Inc.
Represented By: John Martin Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?