Securities and Exchange Commission v. Property Income Investors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Anthony Nicolosi, Property Income Investors 417 LLC, Property Income Investors 304 LLC, Property Income Investors LLC, Property Income Investors 3504 LLC, Property Income Investors 4020 LLC, Equinox Holdings Inc., Property Income Investors 4450 LLC, Property Income Investors 3050 LLC, Anthony Peluso, Larry B. Brodman, Property Income Investors 1361 LLC, Property Income Investors 26 LLC, Property Income Investors 9007 LLC and Property Income Investors 201 LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv61176
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sum, Alice)
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT First Interim Quarterly by Miranda L. Soto (Maglich, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Authorization to Retain Legal, Forensic Accounting, Information Technology, Tax, and Website Professionals. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Miranda L. Soto Receivers Notice Of Soliciting Proposals From Real Estate Professionals For Marketing And Liquidation Of Receivership Real Property Assets (Maglich, Jordan)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Miranda L. Soto for property located at Broward And Palm Beach County ; Grantees: PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS, LLC, EQUINOX HOLDINGS, INC., PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 26, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 304, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 201, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 3504, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 1361, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 4020, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 9007, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 417, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 4450, LLC, PROPERTY INCOME INVESTORS 3050, LLC, LARRY B. BRODMAN and ANTHONY NICOLOSI (f/k/a ANTHONY PELUSO), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lis Pendens Broward, #2 Exhibit B - Lis Pendens Broward, #3 Exhibit C - Lis Pendens Broward, #4 Exhibit D - Lis Pendens Broward, #5 Exhibit E - Lis Pendens Broward, #6 Exhibit F - Lis Pendens Broward, #7 Exhibit G - Lis Pendens Palm Beach) (Maglich, Jordan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION For Authorization to Retain Legal, Forensic Accounting, Information Technology, Tax, and Website Professionals by Miranda L. Soto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Maglich, Jordan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Receiver's Expedited Unopposed Motion For Authorization To Retain Keyes Property Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION For Authorization to Retain Keyes Property Management by Miranda L. Soto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Management Agreement and Owners Booklet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Maglich, Jordan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan David Maglich on behalf of Miranda L. Soto. Attorney Jordan David Maglich added to party Miranda L. Soto(pty:rc). (Maglich, Jordan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raquel A. Rodriguez on behalf of Miranda L. Soto. Attorney Raquel A. Rodriguez added to party Miranda L. Soto(pty:rc). (Rodriguez, Raquel)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark C. Perry on behalf of Anthony Nicolosi (Perry, Mark)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Appoint Receiver. Miranda L. Soto appointed. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief as to Defendant against Anthony Nicolosi. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief as to Defendant Larry B. Brodman. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief re #4 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment against Defendants. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony Nicolosi. Attorney Mark C. Perry added to party Anthony Nicolosi(pty:dft). (Perry, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/11/2021. (eca)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief as to PII Entities, #2 Exhibit B - Consent of PII Entities, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief as to Defendant Brodman, #4 Exhibit D Consent of Defendant Broadman, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief as to Defendant Nicolosi, #6 Exhibit F - Consent of Defendant Nicolosi)(Sum, Alice)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed Expedited MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 6/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resume of Jeffrey L. Cox, #2 Exhibit 2 - Biography of Grisel Alonso, #3 Exhibit 3- Biography of Miranda L. Soto, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sum, Alice)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sum, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Property Income Investors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Nicolosi
Represented By: Mark C. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 417 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 304 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 3504 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 4020 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinox Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 4450 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 3050 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Peluso
Represented By: Mark C. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B. Brodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 1361 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 26 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 9007 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Income Investors 201 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Alice Sum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?