Peoples Trust Insurance Company v. Rheem Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv61200
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2021., Discovery due by 1/6/2022., Expert Discovery due by 1/6/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2021., Mediation Deadline 12/13/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/11/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2022., Motions due by 1/14/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/12/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 12/13/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 14, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Grossman, Karen)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint in light of #15 Defendant's Notice of Striking. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/14/2021. (jhy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Rheem Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Paloma Rheem Global, Inc. for Rheem Manufacturing Company (Grossman, Karen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Rheem Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grossman, Karen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by Peoples Trust Insurance Company (Stevens, Theodore)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Peoples Trust Insurance Company. (Stevens, Theodore)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Rheem Manufacturing Company. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (Grossman, Karen)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Striking #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company by Rheem Manufacturing Company (Grossman, Karen)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 STRICKEN per DE #15 [Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by Rheem Manufacturing Company. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (Grossman, Karen) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (jbs).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE re: Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to this case. (jmd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/22/2021. (jhy)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Peoples Trust Insurance Company. Peoples Trust Insurance Company served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Stevens, Theodore)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's Notice of Refiled Action by Rheem Manufacturing Company (Grossman, Karen)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen Foy Grossman on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company. Attorney Karen Foy Grossman added to party Rheem Manufacturing Company(pty:dft). (Grossman, Karen)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marco Antonio Salazar on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company. Attorney Marco Antonio Salazar added to party Rheem Manufacturing Company(pty:dft). (Salazar, Marco)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT nDISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (bb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rheem Manufacturing Company. (bb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14750592, filed by PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Summons)(Stevens, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples Trust Insurance Company v. Rheem Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Theodore A Stevens
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Karen Foy Grossman
Represented By: Marco Antonio Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?