Prescribers Choice, LLC v. Harris
Plaintiff: Prescribers Choice, LLC
Defendant: Michael Harris
Case Number: 0:2021cv61537
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION,STAYING JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS, AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Michael Harris re #8 Order to Show Cause of Non-Objection (Wagner, Lindsey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsey Brooke Wagner on behalf of Michael Harris. Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Michael Harris(pty:dft). (Wagner, Lindsey)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance by Prescribers Choice, LLC re #8 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons, Petition and Order to Show Cause) (Staviscak Diaz, Ondrej)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Prescribers Choice, LLC. Michael Harris served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Summons, Petition and Order to Show Cause)(Staviscak Diaz, Ondrej)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration filed by Prescribers Choice, LLC, #5 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Prescribers Choice, LLC, #3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Prescribers Choice, LLC. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Harris. (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, #3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prescribers Choice, LLC (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/27/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS000014535 (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prescribers Choice, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sincerus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Corporate Parent Sincerus Florida, LLC for Prescribers Choice, LLC (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) to Compel Arbitration. Filing fee $402.00 (PAID), filed by Prescribers Choice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescribers Choice, LLC v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescribers Choice, LLC
Represented By: Ondrej Staviscak Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harris
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?