Land Trust Service Corporation et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc et al
Plaintiff: Land Trust Service Corporation and Julio Chang
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Bank of America, N.A. and Veripro Solutions Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv61565
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
2 Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER re #28 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (osd)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 7/12/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2021., Discovery due by 3/22/2022., Expert Discovery due by 3/22/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 10/26/2021., Mediation Deadline 3/29/2022., In Limine Motions due by 5/3/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2022., Motions due by 4/5/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/3/2022.). Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Joint Motion to Dismiss #21 . Plaintiffs shall file a response by September 28, 2021 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/14/2021. (ob)
September 14, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Joint Motion to Dismiss re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Julio Chang, Land Trust Service Corporation. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Chosid, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Julio Chang, Land Trust Service Corporation (Chosid, Richard)
September 11, 2021 Filing 24 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Joint Scheduling Report Order)(Drosky, Todd)
September 11, 2021 Filing 23 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Bank of America, N.A. (Drosky, Todd)
September 1, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (Removal Status Report) by Veripro Solutions Inc (King, Gregory)
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Veripro Solutions Inc. Attorney Gregory Thomas King added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeal, #4 Exhibit D - Appellate Mandate, #5 Exhibit E - Mr. Chang's Affirmative Defenses, #6 Exhibit F - Land Trust's Affirmative Defenses)(King, Gregory)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Striking Motions. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (as03)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 STRICKEN First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 9/3/2021 (Drosky, Todd) stricken per de#20 Modified on 8/24/2021 (dj).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/10/2021 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 8/19/2021 (drz).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Raag Singhal recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Veripro Solutions Inc. Responses due by 8/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeal, #4 Exhibit D - Appellate Mandate, #5 Exhibit E - Mr. Chang's Affirmative Defenses, #6 Exhibit F - Land Trust's Affirmative Defenses)(King, Gregory)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Response/Answer due 8/20/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/11/2021. (eca)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Drosky, Todd)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Response/Answer due 8/11/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/6/2021. (eca)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc (King, Gregory)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Veripro Solutions Inc. (King, Gregory)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc (King, Gregory)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A. Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Drosky, Todd)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bank of America, N.A. (Drosky, Todd)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/30/2021. (eca)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14886854, filed by Veripro Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service on Veripro, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Papers, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Removal Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Summary Judgment Order, #6 Exhibit F - BCPA Website, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Gregory) Modified Text on 7/30/2021 (drz). ( No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss Filed in State Court)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Land Trust Service Corporation et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Land Trust Service Corporation
Represented By: Richard G. Chosid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Chang
Represented By: Richard G. Chosid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc
Represented By: Gregory Thomas King
Represented By: Todd Christopher Drosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Todd Christopher Drosky
Represented By: Gregory Thomas King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veripro Solutions Inc
Represented By: Gregory Thomas King
Represented By: Marc Jonathan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?