Andres v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Gary M. Andres, Sr
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Kaman Corporation, Bennett Auto Supply, Inc., Nokia of America Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, Tex-Cote LLC, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, H.B. Fuller Company, Boeing Company, ViacomCBS Inc., Koch Industries Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Huntsman Corporation, Morton International, LLC, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, General Electric Company, Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co., Honeywell International, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Honeywell Aerospace, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc., Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Hubbell Lighting Inc., Crane Co., Plastics Engineering Company, Cooper Industries, LLC, Pneumo-Abex, LLC and Eaton Corporation
Case Number: 0:2021cv61757
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, granting #205 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Susan J. Cole, Esq. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 14, 2021 Filing 206 Initial Disclosure(s) by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald)
October 14, 2021 Filing 205 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel M. Finer, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #191 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Susan)
October 14, 2021 Attorney Daniel M. Finer representing Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW,granting #197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Casey Renee McGowan representing Dow Chemical Company (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW,granting #196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Casey Renee McGowan representing Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 11, 2021 Filing 200 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Will S. Skinner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15081800 by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Responses due by 10/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andersen, Donald)
October 8, 2021 Filing 199 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Huntsman Corporation (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
October 8, 2021 Filing 198 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Huntsman Corporation. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
October 8, 2021 Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Casey McGowan for / by Union Carbide Corporation. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGowan, Casey)
October 8, 2021 Filing 196 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Casey McGowan for / by Dow Chemical Company. Attorney Casey Renee McGowan added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGowan, Casey)
October 8, 2021 Filing 195 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Koch Industries Inc. (Alley, Todd)
October 7, 2021 Filing 194 NOTICE by Eaton Corporation re #146 Notice to Take Deposition Cross-Notice of Deposition of Jim Wheatley (Melaragno, Peter)
October 7, 2021 Filing 193 NOTICE by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. re #146 Notice to Take Deposition Cross-Notice of Deposition of Jim Wheatley (Melaragno, Peter)
October 7, 2021 Filing 192 NOTICE by Cooper Industries, LLC re #146 Notice to Take Deposition Cross-Notice of Deposition of Jim Wheatley (Melaragno, Peter)
October 7, 2021 Filing 191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel M. Finer, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15076294 by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. Responses due by 10/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Susan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 190 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Hubbell Lighting Inc. (Alley, Todd)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas J. Irvin, Esq. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas J. Irvin. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15069319 by Gary M. Andres, Sr. Responses due by 10/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Besserman, Dawn)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Abbie L. Eliasberg Fuchs; granting #175 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bradley M. Wanner; granting #176 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Syed K. Rizvi. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #181 and #182 Defendant Huntsman Corporation's Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have through and including October 8, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/30/2021. (cvl)
September 30, 2021 Filing 185 Defendant Koch Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Koch Industries Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
September 29, 2021 Filing 184 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Flint Hills Resources, LLC (Alley, Todd)
September 29, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE by Huntsman Corporation re #181 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint, #182 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
September 29, 2021 Filing 182 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Huntsman Corporation. (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Huntsman Corporation. (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 180 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Morton International, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 28, 2021 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin on behalf of Huntsman Corporation. Attorney Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin added to party Huntsman Corporation(pty:dft). (Jackson-Fannin, Julian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Morton International, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Granting #173 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added. Charles D. Bavol, Esq., Victoria M. McLaughlin, Esq., and the law firm Bleakley Bavol Enman & Grace are hereby relieved of any further responsibility representing Defendant Morton International, LLC in this matter. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 27, 2021 Filing 176 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Syed K. Rizvi. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15044531 by Kaman Corporation. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Syed K. Rizvi, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallak, Elliot)
September 27, 2021 Filing 175 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bradley M. Wanner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15044519 by Kaman Corporation. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Bradley M. Wanner, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallak, Elliot)
September 27, 2021 Filing 174 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Abbie L. Eliasberg Fuchs. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15044459 by Kaman Corporation. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Abbie L. Eliasberg Fuchs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallak, Elliot)
September 24, 2021 Filing 173 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting PETER J. MELARAGNO OF FOWLER WHITE BURNETT, P.A. for CHARLES D. BAVOL AND VICTORIA M. McLAUGHLIN OF BLEAKLEY BAVOL DENMAN & GRACE by Morton International, LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, DE162 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel with Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B, Proposed Order)(Melaragno, Peter)
September 24, 2021 Filing 172 Amended SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Gary M. Andres, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Besserman, Dawn)
September 24, 2021 Filing 171 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by General Dynamics Corporation (Shapiro, Ari)
September 23, 2021 Filing 170 Initial Disclosure(s) by Ericsson, Inc. (McCormack, Catherine)
September 23, 2021 Filing 169 Initial Disclosure(s) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by Kaman Corporation (Hallak, Elliot)
September 23, 2021 Filing 168 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric SE for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Mason, W.)
September 23, 2021 Filing 167 Initial Disclosure(s) by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC (Cunningham, Troy)
September 23, 2021 Filing 166 Agreed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Gary M. Andres, Sr (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Besserman, Dawn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 165 Initial Disclosure(s) by Crane Co. (Brotman, Kenn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 164 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Tex-Cote LLC. (Klein, Buffey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher William Boyett, Jr on behalf of Crane Co.. Attorney Christopher William Boyett, Jr added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft). (Boyett, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Filing 162 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Morton International, LLC instead of prior counsel of record Charles D. Bavol and Victoria M. McLaughlin of Bleakley Bavol Denman & Grace. . Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Morton International, LLC(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
September 23, 2021 Attorney Peter J. Melaragno representing Morton International, LLC (Defendant) terminated. Per d.e.[162)]. (mee)
September 22, 2021 Filing 161 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Andersen, Donald)
September 22, 2021 Filing 160 Defendant Hubbell Lighting Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Hubbell Lighting Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
September 22, 2021 Filing 159 Defendant Flint Hills Resources, LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Flint Hills Resources, LLC. (Alley, Todd)
September 21, 2021 Filing 158 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC (Cunningham, Troy)
September 17, 2021 Filing 157 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bernardo Pimentel, II on behalf of Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Attorney Bernardo Pimentel, II added to party Pneumo-Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Pimentel, Bernardo)
September 17, 2021 Filing 156 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ericsson, Inc. (McCormack, Catherine)
September 17, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine A McCormack on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (McCormack, Catherine)
September 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines Morton International, LLC answer due 10/4/2021. Per DE#153. (cqs)
September 16, 2021 Filing 154 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaman Corporation (Hallak, Elliot)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #152 DEFENDANT MORTON INTERNATIONAL, LLCS SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant Morton International, LLC shall have through and including October 4, 2021 to respond to the complaint. No further extensions of deadline will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/16/2021. (cvl)
September 16, 2021 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Morton International, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Bavol, Charles)
September 16, 2021 Filing 151 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boeing Company (Pazos, Lucia)
September 16, 2021 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate Occidental Chemical Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Oxy USA, Inc. for Occidental Chemical Corporation (Quintana, Kayla)
September 16, 2021 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kayla Keller Quintana on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney Kayla Keller Quintana added to party Occidental Chemical Corporation(pty:dft). (Quintana, Kayla)
September 16, 2021 Filing 148 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC. (Cunningham, Troy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 147 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc for Dow Chemical Company (Drumm, Ashley)
September 15, 2021 Filing 146 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Wheatley by Gary M. Andres, Sr.(Fiallo, Jovanni)
September 14, 2021 Filing 145 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nokia of America Corporation (Reddin, John)
September 14, 2021 Filing 144 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by General Dynamics Corporation. (Shapiro, Ari)
September 14, 2021 Filing 143 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Curtis-Wright Corporation (Holt, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Filing 142 Initial Disclosure(s) by Plastics Engineering Company (Medina, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 141 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald)
September 13, 2021 Filing 140 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed No Parents or Affiliates by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald)
September 10, 2021 Filing 139 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Other Affiliate GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate Wuhan Boiler Company Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate GE Capital for General Electric Company (Collings, Christopher)
September 10, 2021 Filing 138 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. (Collings, Christopher)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, granting #134 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Erik C. DiMarco ; granting #135 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael John Ramirez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 10, 2021 Filing 136 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation (Drumm, Ashley)
September 10, 2021 Filing 135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael John Ramirez. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-14999259. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by General Dynamics Corporation. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Ari)
September 10, 2021 Filing 134 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erik C. DiMarco. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14999293 by General Dynamics Corporation. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Ari)
September 9, 2021 Filing 133 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooper Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc, for Cooper Industries, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
September 9, 2021 Filing 132 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc, for Eaton Corporation (Melaragno, Peter)
September 9, 2021 Filing 131 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Crane Co. (Brotman, Kenn)
September 9, 2021 Filing 130 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Mason, W.)
September 9, 2021 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Scott Mason on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Attorney W. Scott Mason added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Mason, W.)
September 9, 2021 Filing 128 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo-Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke)
September 9, 2021 Filing 127 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Dynamics Corporation (Shapiro, Ari)
September 9, 2021 Filing 126 Defendant's MOTION to Adopt/Join #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by General Dynamics Corporation. Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Granting General Dynamics Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment)(Shapiro, Ari)
September 8, 2021 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC identifying Corporate Parent Henkel of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Corporate Parent Henkel of America I LLC, Corporate Parent Henkel US Operation Corporation for Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC (Cunningham, Troy)
September 8, 2021 Filing 124 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 123 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wyeth Holdings LLC (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 122 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rohr, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 121 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 120 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 119 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leeds & Northrup Company (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 118 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 117 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #115 Defendant Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 9/17/2021. Defendant filed its motion for extension of time more than a week after its answer was due and provides no explanation for doing so. The Court warns the parties that this lack of diligence will not be tolerated in the future. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/8/2021. (cvl)
September 8, 2021 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC. Attorney Troy Patrick Cunningham added to party Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC(pty:dft). (Cunningham, Troy)
September 8, 2021 Filing 114 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by H.B. Fuller Company identifying Corporate Parent H.B. Fuller Company for H.B. Fuller Company (Mercer, David)
September 8, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart L. Cohen on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation. Attorney Stuart L. Cohen added to party Nokia of America Corporation(pty:dft). (Cohen, Stuart)
September 8, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation (Reddin, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 111 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nokia of America Corporation. (Reddin, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 110 Initial Disclosure(s) of Certificate of Interested Persons by Nokia of America Corporation (Reddin, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 109 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Iovino, Caroline)
September 8, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Carrie Kibbe on behalf of Boeing Company. Attorney Rebecca Carrie Kibbe added to party Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Kibbe, Rebecca)
September 7, 2021 Filing 107 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Chemical LP identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc. for Shell Chemical LP (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
September 7, 2021 Filing 106 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Shell Chemical LP. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
September 7, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Shell Chemical LP. Attorney Caitlyn R. McCutcheon added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:dft). (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
September 7, 2021 Filing 104 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morton International, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Rohm and Haas, Co. for Morton International, LLC (Bavol, Charles)
September 7, 2021 Filing 103 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co. identifying Corporate Parent Imperial Industries, Inc. for Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 7, 2021 Filing 102 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
September 7, 2021 Filing 101 Certificate of Other Affiliates Certificate of Interested Parties by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Melaragno, Peter)
September 7, 2021 Filing 100 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 7, 2021 Filing 99 Certificate of Other Affiliates Certificate of Interested Persons and Disclosure Statement by Gary M. Andres, Sr (Fiallo, Jovanni)
September 7, 2021 Filing 98 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Plastics Engineering Company (Medina, Eduardo)
September 7, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jovanni Christopher Fiallo on behalf of Gary M. Andres, Sr. Attorney Jovanni Christopher Fiallo added to party Gary M. Andres, Sr(pty:pla). (Fiallo, Jovanni)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Tex-Cote, LLC shall have through and including September 23, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/3/2021. (cvl)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #88 Specially Appearing Defendant Koch Industries Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/23/2021. (cvl)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #87 Specially Appearing Defendant Hubbell Lighting Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/3/2021. (cvl)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #86 Specially Appearing Defendant Flint Hills Resources, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/3/2021. (cvl)
September 3, 2021 Filing 92 STATUS REPORT (JOINT REMOVAL STATUS REPORT) by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Cole, Susan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 91 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint by Tex-Cote LLC. Attorney Buffey E. Klein added to party Tex-Cote LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/17/2021 (Klein, Buffey)
September 2, 2021 Filing 90 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Boeing Company. (Pazos, Lucia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE by Boeing Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Joinder in Removal and Independent Bases for Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Exposure Sheet for John R. Andres, #3 Exhibit C - Information Form for John R. Andres) (Pazos, Lucia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Koch Industries Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
September 2, 2021 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hubbell Lighting Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
September 2, 2021 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Flint Hills Resources, LLC. (Alley, Todd)
September 2, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucia V. Pazos on behalf of Boeing Company. Attorney Lucia V. Pazos added to party Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Pazos, Lucia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 84 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony)
September 2, 2021 Filing 83 Ericsson's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Ericsson, Inc.. Attorney Catherine A McCormack added to party Ericsson, Inc.(pty:dft). (McCormack, Catherine)
September 2, 2021 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation (Melaragno, Peter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Joinder (Melaragno, Peter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 80 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #78 Defendant Morton International LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 9/17/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/17/2021. (cvl)
September 1, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Morton International, LLC. (Bavol, Charles)
September 1, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Dennis Bavol on behalf of Morton International, LLC. Attorney Charles Dennis Bavol added to party Morton International, LLC(pty:dft). (Bavol, Charles)
September 1, 2021 Filing 76 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Kaman Corporation. (Hallak, Elliot)
September 1, 2021 Filing 75 Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney TerryAnn Suzanne Howell added to party Occidental Chemical Corporation(pty:dft). (Howell, TerryAnn)
September 1, 2021 Filing 74 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 1, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elliot Aaron Hallak on behalf of Kaman Corporation. Attorney Elliot Aaron Hallak added to party Kaman Corporation(pty:dft). (Hallak, Elliot)
September 1, 2021 Filing 72 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 1, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.. (Melaragno, Peter)
September 1, 2021 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 1, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Drumm, Ashley)
September 1, 2021 Filing 68 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bennett Auto Supply, Inc. (Garcia, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 67 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.. (Garcia, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 66 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Dow Chemical Company. Attorney Ashley Christina Pears Drumm added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft). (Drumm, Ashley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Crane Co.. (Brotman, Kenn)
August 31, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenn Brotman on behalf of Crane Co.. Attorney Kenn Brotman added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft). (Brotman, Kenn)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER re #50 Order of Recusal, #6 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (osd)
August 31, 2021 Filing 62 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 61 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Collings, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodrich Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by H.B. Fuller Company. Attorney David Andrew Mercer added to party H.B. Fuller Company(pty:dft). (Mercer, David)
August 31, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Attorney Henry Salas added to party Pneumo-Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Salas, Henry)
August 31, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Plastics Engineering Company. (Medina, Eduardo)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #48 Corrected Motion for Extension of Time in light of 47 Paperless Order granting an extension through and including September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/31/2021. (cvl)
August 31, 2021 Filing 48 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order CORREPROPOSED ORDER ON CORRECTED MOTION BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED MOTION FOR EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Andersen, Donald)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Teledyne Technologies Incorporated's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Teledyne Technologies Incorporated shall have through and including September 23, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/31/2021. (cvl)
August 30, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Ross Andersen on behalf of Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald)
August 30, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rohr, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 30, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leeds & Northrup Company. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 30, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Striking #37 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Pneumo-Abex, LLC, #38 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Pneumo-Abex, LLC by Pneumo-Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke)
August 30, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
August 30, 2021 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Attorney Donald Ross Andersen added to party Teledyne Technologies Incorporated(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer/Response to Complaint)(Andersen, Donald)
August 30, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand and Notice of Adoption by Pneumo-Abex, LLC. (Sturge, Clarke)
August 30, 2021 Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re #37 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #38 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (mee)
August 30, 2021 Filing 38 STRICKEN-NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarke Scott Sturge on behalf of Pneumo-Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke) Modified on 8/31/2021 (mee). Per d.e. #43 .
August 30, 2021 Filing 37 STRICKEN-NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarke Scott Sturge on behalf of Pneumo-Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke) Modified on 8/31/2021 (mee). Per d.e. #43 .
August 30, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarke Scott Sturge on behalf of Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Attorney Clarke Scott Sturge added to party Pneumo-Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Sturge, Clarke)
August 30, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Curtis-Wright Corporation. (Holt, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Stephen Smith, III on behalf of Curtis-Wright Corporation. Attorney M. Stephen Smith, III added to party Curtis-Wright Corporation(pty:dft). (Smith, M.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Roland Holt on behalf of Curtis-Wright Corporation. Attorney Michael Roland Holt added to party Curtis-Wright Corporation(pty:dft). (Holt, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc.. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari Chaim Shapiro on behalf of Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.. Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.(pty:dft). (Shapiro, Ari)
August 27, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Leeds & Northrup Company(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Rohr, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alberto Garcia on behalf of Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.. Attorney Daniel Alberto Garcia added to party Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garcia, Daniel)
August 26, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Renee McGowan on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Casey Renee McGowan added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (McGowan, Casey)
August 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Stephen Cobbs on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Ryan Stephen Cobbs added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (Cobbs, Ryan)
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Christina Pears Drumm on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Ashley Christina Pears Drumm added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (Drumm, Ashley)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brianna Elizabeth Donet on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Brianna Elizabeth Donet added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (Donet, Brianna)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eduardo J Medina on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company. Attorney Eduardo J Medina added to party Plastics Engineering Company(pty:dft). (Medina, Eduardo)
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Nolan Upshaw on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Anthony Nolan Upshaw added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Upshaw, Anthony)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Marie Iovino on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Caroline Marie Iovino added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Iovino, Caroline)
August 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Jane Cole on behalf of Goodrich Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC (Cole, Susan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Goodrich Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Leeds & Northrup Company(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Rohr, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Goodrich Corporation. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Eaton Corporation. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Cooper Industries, LLC(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Hubbell Lighting Inc., Koch Industries Inc.. Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Davis, Evelyn)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Hubbell Lighting Inc., Koch Industries Inc.. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Alley, Todd)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Calendar Call set for 8/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/16/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for discovery matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc., Bennett Auto Supply, Inc., Boeing Company, Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc., Cooper Industries, LLC, Crane Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Ericsson, Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, H.B. Fuller Company, Honeywell Aerospace, Honeywell International, Inc., Hubbell Lighting Inc., Huntsman Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Kaman Corporation, Koch Industries Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC, Morton International, LLC, Nokia of America Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo-Abex, LLC, Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Tex-Cote LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc. and Wyeth Holdings LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Kaman Corporation, Bennett Auto Supply, Inc., Nokia of America Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, Tex-Cote LLC, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, H.B. Fuller Company, Boeing Company, ViacomCBS Inc., Koch Industries Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Huntsman Corporation, Morton International, LLC, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, General Electric Company, Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co., Honeywell International, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Honeywell Aerospace, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc., Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Hubbell Lighting Inc., Crane Co., Plastics Engineering Company, Cooper Industries, LLC and Pneumo-Abex, LLC.. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Boeing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Cooper Industries, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Curtis-Wright Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Ericsson, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party H.B. Fuller Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Honeywell Aerospace (pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Huntsman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Kaman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Leeds & Northrup Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Morton International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Nokia of America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Occidental Chemical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Plastics Engineering Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Pneumo-Abex, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Rohr, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Teledyne Technologies Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Tex-Cote LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14948451,no answer/affirmative defenses filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cole, Susan) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andres v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M. Andres, Sr
Represented By: Dawn Marie Besserman
Represented By: Jovanni Christopher Fiallo
Represented By: Thomas J. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources, LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaman Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Abbie L. Eliasberg Fuchs
Represented By: Bradley M. Wanner
Represented By: Elliot Aaron Hallak
Represented By: Syed K. Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Ari Chaim Shapiro
Represented By: Daniel Alberto Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Stuart L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Represented By: M. Stephen Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tex-Cote LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Buffey E. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: W. Scott Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeds & Northrup Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: David Andrew Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Lucia V. Pazos
Represented By: Rebecca Carrie Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohr, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Kayla Keller Quintana
Represented By: TerryAnn Suzanne Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pears Drumm
Represented By: Casey Renee McGowan
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Cobbs
Represented By: Brianna Elizabeth Donet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton International, LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Charles Dennis Bavol
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teledyne Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: William S. Skinner
Represented By: Donald Ross Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Anthony Nolan Upshaw
Represented By: Caroline Marie Iovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Ari Chaim Shapiro
Represented By: Erik DiMarco
Represented By: Michael John Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Aerospace
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pears Drumm
Represented By: Casey Renee McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Troy Patrick Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Catherine A McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Lighting Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Christopher William Boyett, Jr.
Represented By: Kenn Brotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Eduardo J Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex, LLC
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Bernardo Pimentel, II
Represented By: Clarke Scott Sturge
Represented By: Henry Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?