James Dar, LLC v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Dar, LLC
Defendant: OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 0:2021cv61901
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE by James Dar, LLC NOTICE OF SERVING OFFER OF JUDGEMENT/ PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS, OJ COMMERCE, LLC AND OJCOMMERCE.COM, INC., PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 68 AND FLORIDA STATUTE 768.79 (Thomas, Donald)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 5/20/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 11/15/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2022., Fact Discovery due by 5/13/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2021., Mediation Deadline 5/20/2022., In Limine Motions due by 10/14/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2022., Motions due by 10/14/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/14/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 8, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #31 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Hecht, Shlomo)
October 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by James Dar, LLC (Thomas, Donald)
October 1, 2021 Filing 30 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by James Dar, LLC (Thomas, Donald)
October 1, 2021 Filing 29 Initial Disclosure(s) by James Dar, LLC (Thomas, Donald)
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by James Dar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE)(Thomas, Donald)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald J. Thomas on behalf of James Dar, LLC. Attorney Donald J. Thomas added to party James Dar, LLC(pty:pla). (Thomas, Donald)
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint - Miscellaneous FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2021 (Hecht, Shlomo)
September 10, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shlomo Y Hecht on behalf of OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. Attorney Shlomo Y Hecht added to party OJCOMMERCE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shlomo Y Hecht added to party OJCommerce.com, Inc.(pty:dft). (Hecht, Shlomo)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS- Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/1/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney JenFeng Lee, Kenneth K. Tanji, Jr and Selena Rojhani, mailing date September 10, 2021, (pt)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-05422. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. #9 ) and GRANTING Defendants Motion to Transfer (Dkt. #10 ). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motions #9 and #10 set for Monday, September 13, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 7, 2021 Filing 18 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 filed by Defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
September 5, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objection to Defendants' Motion to Transfer; and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. (Rojhani, Selena)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY Reply in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Declaration of Selena Rojhani)(Rojhani, Selena)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 filed by Defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 with proof of service filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani in support of opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D in support of opposition)(Rojhani, Selena)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shlomo Y. Hecht, #2 Exhibit D)(Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC, (Rojhani, Selena)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida filed by defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORIES, #2 Declaration of Jacob Weiss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order) (Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case) (Rojhani, Selena)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to OJCommerce, LLC answer now due 8/9/2021; OJCommerce.com, Inc. answer now due 8/9/2021, filed by defendants OJCommerce, LLC; OJCommerce.com, Inc..(Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
July 2, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc., filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. Filed in State Court on 4/30/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc., identifying NONE. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, Santa Monica Courthouse, case number 21SMCV00815 Receipt No: ACACDC-31574347 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1-Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit 1-ADR Package, #5 Declaration of Hecht, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jen-Feng Lee added to party OJCOMMERCE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jen-Feng Lee added to party OJCommerce.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Jen-Feng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Dar, LLC v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dar, LLC
Represented By: Donald J. Thomas
Represented By: Selena Rojhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCOMMERCE, LLC
Represented By: Shlomo Y Hecht
Represented By: Kenneth Kazuo Tanji, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCommerce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Shlomo Y Hecht
Represented By: Kenneth Kazuo Tanji, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?