SkyJet Elite, Corp v. Lu Investments Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SkyJet Elite, Corp.
Defendant: Lu Investments, Inc., Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee and Lim Ung
Case Number: 0:2021cv61979
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by SkyJet Elite, Corp. (Schneider, Mark)
November 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee, Lu Investments, Inc., Lim Ung for dates of 12/21/2021 - 01-03-2022 (Eversole, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee, Lu Investments, Inc., Lim Ung. (Eversole, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee. Response/Answer due 10/29/2021; Lu Investments, Inc.. Response/Answer due 10/29/2021; Lim Ung. Response/Answer due 10/29/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee, Lu Investments, Inc., Lim Ung. (Eversole, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by SkyJet Elite, Corp.. Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee served on 9/24/2021, response/answer due 10/15/2021. (Schneider, Mark)
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F Eversole, III on behalf of Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee, Lu Investments, Inc., Lim Ung. Attorney John F Eversole, III added to party Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee(pty:dft), Attorney John F Eversole, III added to party Lu Investments, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John F Eversole, III added to party Lim Ung(pty:dft). (Eversole, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SkyJet Elite, Corp. re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Schneider, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by SkyJet Elite, Corp.. Lim Ung served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Striking DE-10 by SkyJet Elite, Corp. (Schneider, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Notice of Action/Publication. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (cds)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 (STRICKEN PER DE#12 ) Notice of Action/Publication filed by SkyJet Elite, Corp.. Lim Ung answer/written defenses due by 10/20/2021. (Schneider, Mark) Modified Text on 10/4/2021 (cds).
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, DE# 8 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by SkyJet Elite, Corp.. Lu Investments, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (For Image See DE#7 ) (cds)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SkyJet Elite, Corp. (Schneider, Mark)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY MAIL. Granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for an Order Directing Service on Australian Defendant by Mail. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE ON AUSTRALIAN DEFENDANT BY MAIL by SkyJet Elite, Corp.. (Schneider, Mark)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee, Lu Investments, Inc., Lim Ung. (cds)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15029115, filed by SkyJet Elite Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Schneider, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SkyJet Elite, Corp v. Lu Investments Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkyJet Elite, Corp.
Represented By: Mark Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Investments, Inc.
Represented By: John F Eversole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Trustee
Represented By: John F Eversole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lim Ung
Represented By: John F Eversole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?