Amazing Glove SDN.BHD v. SN DME, LLC
Plaintiff: Amazing Glove SDN.BHD
Defendant: SN DME, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv62070
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by SN DME, LLC. (Goldberg, Fred)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Plaintiff Amazing Glove SDN.BHD's Response in Opposition to Defendant SN DME, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD. Replies due by 11/22/2021. (Graham, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants nunc pro tunc #12 the Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, J. (agn)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor Manuel Arca Rojas on behalf of SN DME, LLC. Attorney Victor Manuel Arca Rojas added to party SN DME, LLC(pty:dft). (Arca Rojas, Victor)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by SN DME, LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2021 (Goldberg, Fred)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 10/29/2021. (jz)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by SN DME, LLC. Attorney Fred Owen Goldberg added to party SN DME, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Fred)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified date filed on 10/15/2021 (jbs).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #5 motion to appear pro hac vice, consent to designation, and request to electronically receive notices of electronic filings. Attorney Christopher J. Weldy is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff Amazing Glove. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD. (Graham, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD identifying Other Affiliate Kah Yoong Low, Other Affiliate Joe Low for Amazing Glove SDN.BHD (Graham, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (Low Kah Yoong a/k/a Joe Low) (jbs)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD (Graham, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher J. Weldy. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15071210 by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD. Responses due by 10/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Graham, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Christopher J. Weldy, mailing date October 5, 2021, (pt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SN DME, LLC(jbs)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SN DME, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15064236, filed by Amazing Glove SDN.BHD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 Contract, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Graham, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazing Glove SDN.BHD v. SN DME, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazing Glove SDN.BHD
Represented By: Matthew M Graham
Represented By: Christopher J. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN DME, LLC
Represented By: Fred Owen Goldberg
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arca Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?