Orso v. Infante
Plaintiff: Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Defendant: Rodolfo Infante and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2021mc60184
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #15 Answer to Writ of Garnishment as to JP Morgan Chase Bank (Emery, Alison)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #11 Answer to Writ of Garnishment as to Bank of America (Emery, Alison)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/31/2021. (Herron, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #6 Writ of Garnishment on Regions Bank (Emery, Alison)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #7 Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America (Emery, Alison)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #8 Writ of Garnishment as to Chase Bank (Emery, Alison)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Bank of America, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/18/2021. (Noa, Joseph)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Motion and Order for Appointment of ABC Legal as Process Server. re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server ABC Legal filed by Matthew Orso Signed by Deputy Clerk (drz)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server ABC Legal by Matthew Orso. Responses due by 3/4/2021 (Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. in the amount of $ 5,865.50 re: #4 Motion for Writ filed by Matthew Orso. (drz)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Bank of America, N.A. in the amount of $ 5,865.50 re: #3 Motion for Writ filed by Matthew Orso. (drz)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Regions Bank in the amount of $ 5,865.50 re: #5 Motion for Writ filed by Matthew Orso. (drz)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Regions Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on JPMorgan Chase Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
January 25, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (drz)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (drz)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment against Rodolfo Infante. Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14278284, filed by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emery, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orso v. Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew R. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Represented By: Alison Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Noa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?