Orso et al v. Disner et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Bell, in his capacity as court appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com, Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com and Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond, David Kettner, P.A.W.S Capital Management, LLC, David Sorrells, Durant Brockett, Eldad Shemesh, Mary Kettner, Darren Miller, Global Internet Formula, Inc., Karen Silver, Michael Van Leeuwen, Innovation Marketing, LLC, Shara Andrews, T. Lemont Silver, Todd Disner et al, Lori Jean Weber, Trudy Gilmond, LLC, Rhonda Gates, Jerry Napier, Aaron Andrews, P.A.W.S. Capital Management, LLC, Todd Disner, Wells Fargo Bank NA and a defendant class of Net Winners in Zeekrewards.com
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A., Centennial Bank, TD Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2021mc60198
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER appointing process server. Re: #13 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server ABC Legal filed by Matthew Orso. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 4/5/2021. (Herron, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Statutory Garnishment Fee by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 4/1/2021. (Ayers, William)
March 12, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #17 Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Bank of America, NA (Emery, Alison)
March 8, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #10 Writ of Garnishment on JP Morgan Chase Bank (Emery, Alison)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by TD Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/25/2021. (Glickman, Barry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #9 Writ of Garnishment on Centennial Bank (Emery, Alison)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Bank of America, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/25/2021. (Noa, Joseph)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Centennial Bank. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/24/2021. (Fry, Megan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 15 Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed Date of Service 02/25/2021 as to Bank of America. (Emery, Alison)
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Orso re #8 Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America (Emery, Alison)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server ABC Legal by Matthew Orso. Responses due by 3/11/2021 (Emery, Alison)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the amount of $ 8,154.25 (pcs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee TD Bank, N.A. in the amount of $ 8,154.25 (pcs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA in the amount of $ 8,154.25 (pcs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Centennial Bank in the amount of $ 8,154.25 (pcs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Bank of America, NA in the amount of $ 8,154.25 (pcs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Wells Fargo Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on TD Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on JPMorgan Chase Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Centennial Bank by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
January 26, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (jas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (jas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment against Eldad Shemesh. Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14287418, filed by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emery, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orso et al v. Disner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.W.S Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durant Brockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldad Shemesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Internet Formula, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Van Leeuwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shara Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lemont Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Disner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Jean Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.W.S. Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Disner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: William Patrick Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a defendant class of Net Winners in Zeekrewards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Bell, in his capacity as court appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Represented By: Alison Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Noa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Centennial Bank
Represented By: Megan Fortson Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Barry Jay Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew R. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?