Lawson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tony Lawson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 0:2022cv60355
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #13 Summons Issued as to USA, #12 Order. ( Package Prepared for Marshal Service) (drz)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 Summons issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drz)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER requiring Summons Reissued as to Defendant, Commissioner of Social Security.The United States Marshal is Ordered to serve the Defendant with the summons and a copy of the Complaint at the addresses listed in the text of the Order. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/12/2022. (qhq)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #10 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/8/2022. (qhq)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STRICKEN PER PAPERLESS ORDER DE# 11 -SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/7/2022. (jz) Modified on 4/8/2022 (drz).
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Summons Issued as to USA. (Documents forwarded to US Marshals Office) (amb)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General (amb)
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason: Summons(es) incomplete, missing information. (lbc)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/23/2022. (qhq)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters.. (bb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Tony Lawson to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: gracebadger1@gmail.com (pc)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Lawson. (pc)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration. Filing fees $ 402.00 (fee not paid) Motion for IFP Filed by Tony Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?