Elshater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Haidy Ivonn Elshater
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 0:2022cv60466
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before May 31, 2022, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon Defendant or show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by May 31, 2022 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 4/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno on behalf of Haidy Ivonn Elshater. Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno added to party Haidy Ivonn Elshater(pty:pla). (Palacios-Moreno, Katherine)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for All Pretrial Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 3/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mab)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Haidy Ivonn Elshater against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15439522, filed by Haidy Ivonn Elshater. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Oliver, Rogelio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elshater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haidy Ivonn Elshater
Represented By: Rogelio Ramon Oliver
Represented By: Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?