Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Reinhard Antonio Garcia
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2022cv60757
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to US Attorney General of the United States. (scn)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Kilolo Kijakazi served on 5/17/2022, response/answer due 7/18/2022. (scn)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals as to United States Attorney's Office served on 5/24/2022, response/answer due 7/25/2022. (mee)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's NOTICE of Compliance (copy of complaint and summons provided to Marshal dept to serve) re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (mee)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mee)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting (DE #3 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered. Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (ab03)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noticing Social Security US Attorney on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney Noticing Social Security US Attorney added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft). (mee)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reinhard Antonio Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mee)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Reinhard Antonio Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Indigency IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order IFP, #4 Summon(s) OGC, #5 Summon(s) USAG, #6 Summon(s) USAO, #7 Summon(s) 285 OGC, #8 Summon(s) 285 USAG, #9 Summon(s) 285 USAO)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Berke, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinhard Antonio Garcia
Represented By: Bill B Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?