Guasto v. Propel Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Guasto
Defendant: Propel Holdings Inc. and Propel Holdings Inc. doing business as CREDITFRESH
Case Number: 0:2022cv60871
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by Propel Holdings Inc. Response/Answer due 7/13/2022. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/9/2022. (pb00)
June 8, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Propel Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi on behalf of Nicholas Guasto. Attorney Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi added to party Nicholas Guasto(pty:pla). (Hindi, Jibrael)
May 31, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Gomes Simil on behalf of Nicholas Guasto. Attorney Jennifer Gomes Simil added to party Nicholas Guasto(pty:pla). (Simil, Jennifer)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2023 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2022., Discovery due by 6/29/2023., Expert Discovery due by 6/29/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 9/10/2022., Mediation Deadline 7/6/2023., In Limine Motions due by 9/8/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2023., Motions due by 7/14/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/10/2023.). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 28, 2022 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Nicholas Guasto (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hiraldo, Manuel)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Response/Answer shall be filed on or before 6/13/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/11/2022. (pb00)
May 10, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Set the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Propel Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicholas Guasto. Propel Holdings Inc. served on 4/14/2022, response/answer due 5/5/2022. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gabriel W. Slater. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/9/2022. (pb00)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert C. Collins III. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/9/2022. (pb00)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/9/2022. (pb00)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/9/2022. (pb00)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gabriel W. Slater. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15622641 by Propel Holdings Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert C. Collins III. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15622596 by Propel Holdings Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Propel Holdings Inc. (Goldberg, Martin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert C. Collins III and Gabriel Slater, mailing date May 9, 2022, (pt)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nan)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15620406, filed by Propel Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint & State Court Summons #3 Exhibit 2 - Other State Court Documents, No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed.)(Goldberg, Martin) Modified Attachment Descriptions on 5/9/2022 (nan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guasto v. Propel Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Guasto
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Represented By: Jennifer Gomes Simil
Represented By: Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Martin B. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Holdings Inc. doing business as CREDITFRESH
Represented By: Gabriel W. Slater
Represented By: Robert C. Collins, III
Represented By: Martin B. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?