Galette v. Goodell et al
Plaintiff: Junior Galette
Defendant: Roger Goodell, Seattle Seahawks, Los Angeles Rams, Las Vegas Raiders, Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Carolina Panthers, Washington Football Team and J. C. Tretter
Case Number: 0:2022cv61565
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Las Vegas Raiders served on 10/11/2022, response/answer due 11/1/2022. (pcs)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC served on 10/10/2022, response/answer due 10/31/2022; Junior Galette served on 9/14/2022, response/answer due 10/5/2022; Kansas City Chiefs Football Club served on 10/12/2022, response/answer due 11/2/2022; Seattle Seahawks served on 10/18/2022, response/answer due 11/8/2022. (pcs)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendant Washington Commanders' Motion to Respond to Complaint Out-of-Time, ECF No. #14 , is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #15 , is deemed to be a timely response by Defendant Washington Commanders. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (aun)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice, for failure to comply with Local Rule 56.1 which requires that motions for summary judgment be accompanied by a separate statement of material facts. Plaintiff may renew his motion at an appropriate time, following the disposition of Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (aun)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Benjamin C. Block. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (aun)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin C. Block. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16031972 by Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Seattle Seahawks, Washington Football Team. Responses due by 11/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Benjamin C. Block, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverglate, Spencer)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Compliance with Local Rule 16.1 Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss by Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Seattle Seahawks, Washington Football Team. Responses due by 11/1/2022 (Silverglate, Spencer)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 11/1/2022) by Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Seattle Seahawks, Washington Football Team. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Bayer)(Silverglate, Spencer)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, Nunc Pro Tunc by Washington Football Team. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mali Friedman)(Silverglate, Spencer)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Seattle Seahawks, Washington Football Team (Silverglate, Spencer)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to CSC. (pcs)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Mark Diffenbough. (pcs)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Junior Galette. Responses due by 10/27/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(pcs)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re #4 Summons Issued,. Document Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (ls)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Junior Galette to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: AlphaLives@Yahoo.com (ls)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carolina Panthers, Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Las Vegas Raiders, Los Angeles Rams, Seattle Seahawks, J. C. Tretter, Washington Football Team. (ls) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/23/2022) (ls).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/23/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number 15945 (ls)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ls)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolina Panthers, Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Roger Goodell, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Las Vegas Raiders, Los Angeles Rams, Seattle Seahawks, J. C. Tretter, Washington Football Team. Filing fees $ 402.00 Receipt#: 15945, filed by Junior Galette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galette v. Goodell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Galette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Goodell
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Seahawks
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Rams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Raiders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Panthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Football Team
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Tretter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?