N9 Advisors, LLC, v. Banq, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: N9 Advisors, LLC.
Defendant: Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles and Prime Trust LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv61688
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 32 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order Of Remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: CACE-22-013341 (swr)
November 2, 2022 Filing 31 (Re-docketed, Transmittal did not print) Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order Of Remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: CACE-22-013341. (swr) Modified Text on 11/2/2022 (swr).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND granting #19 Motion to Remand to State Court. Closing Case. Motions DENIED as moot: 22 MOTION Request filed by Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC, Banq, Inc., #24 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Limit Discovery' Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC, Banq, Inc., #26 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Jon Jiles, #27 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Prime Trust LLC, #20 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC, Banq, Inc., #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction filed by N9 Advisors, LLC.. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
November 1, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Banq, Inc.. (Silver, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Roland Chang re #26 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , #27 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Prime Trust LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2022 (Silver, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Jon Jiles. Responses due by 11/15/2022 (Silver, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Limit Discovery' Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand , 22 MOTION Request, #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction, #20 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by N9 Advisors, LLC.. (Funes, Freddy)
October 24, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 11/7/2022), MOTION to Limit Discovery' Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. (King, S. Elizabeth)
October 24, 2022 Filing 23 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #21 Response to Motion. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (cds)
October 24, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION/REQUEST for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. For Image See DE#21 (cds)
October 24, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction filed by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Replies due by 10/31/2022. (King, S. Elizabeth)
October 21, 2022 Filing 20 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Attorney S. Elizabeth King added to party Banq, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney S. Elizabeth King added to party Jon Jiles(pty:dft), Attorney S. Elizabeth King added to party Prime Trust LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(King, S. Elizabeth)
October 10, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction by N9 Advisors, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Banq First Amended and Restated Articles, #2 Exhibit 2022 Banq Annual Report, #3 Exhibit Declaration of David Koche)(Funes, Freddy)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Roland Chang. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/6/2022. (tcl)
October 6, 2022 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roland Chang. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Responses due by 10/20/2022 (Silver, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Roland Chang. Pro Hac Vice attorney Roland Chang may not be added to the case because the party listed in the Pro Hac Vice Motion indicates Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chang is appearing as co-counsel on behalf of "c" and there is no such party. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/5/2022. (tcl)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David R. Callaway. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/5/2022. (tcl)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Darryl M. Woo. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/5/2022. (tcl)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, and Prime Trust LLC shall file their Response/Answer by 11/1/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/5/2022. (tcl)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Trust LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prime Core Technologies, Inc. for Prime Trust LLC (Silver, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banq, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Senior Comfort Corporation, Other Affiliate Eagles Nest, LLC, Other Affiliate The J. Max Jiles Trust for Banq, Inc. (Silver, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roland Chang. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15999767 by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2022 (Silver, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David R. Callaway. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15999754 by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2022 (Silver, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Darryl M. Woo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15999716 by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2022 (Silver, Michael)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Banq, Inc., Jon Jiles, Prime Trust LLC. (Silver, Michael)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N9 Advisors, LLC.. Prime Trust LLC served on 9/16/2022, response/answer due 10/7/2022. (Funes, Freddy)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N9 Advisors, LLC.. Banq, Inc. served on 9/19/2022, response/answer due 10/11/2022. (Funes, Freddy)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Banq, Inc., Prime Trust LLC. (cds)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by N9 Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons as to Banq, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons as to Prime Trust) (Funes, Freddy)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15936787, filed by Jon Jiles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint and Other Documents, #3 Exhibit 2)(Silver, Michael) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. Modified Text on 9/9/2022 (swr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N9 Advisors, LLC, v. Banq, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N9 Advisors, LLC.
Represented By: Brian W. Toth
Represented By: Freddy Funes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banq, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Paul Silver
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Represented By: David R. Callaway
Represented By: Roland Chang
Represented By: S. Elizabeth King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Jiles
Represented By: Michael Paul Silver
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Represented By: David R. Callaway
Represented By: Roland Chang
Represented By: S. Elizabeth King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Trust LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Silver
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Represented By: David R. Callaway
Represented By: Roland Chang
Represented By: S. Elizabeth King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?